EP3909213 - PRECONFIGURING DEDICATED RESOURCE INFORMATION IN IDLE MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHA, Xiubin ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
DAI, Bo ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
LU, Ting ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Xu ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 05 /
LIU, Kun ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
SHA, Xiubin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
02 /
DAI, Bo Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | |||
03 /
LU, Ting Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | |||
04 /
LIU, Xu Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | |||
05 /
LIU, Kun Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 19850591.9 | 11.01.2019 | [2021/46] | WO2019CN71449 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020034571 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3909213 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W48/12, H04L5/00, H04L9/40, // H04W48/14 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
H04W48/12 (EP,CN,KR);
H04L5/0094 (EP,CN,KR);
H04L5/001 (EP,CN);
H04W48/14 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/003 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0044 (KR);
H04W48/16 (CN,US);
H04W56/001 (CN,US);
H04W72/21 (EP,CN,KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/46] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | VORKONFIGURATION VON DEDIZIERTEN RESSOURCENINFORMATIONEN IM LEERLAUFMODUS | [2021/46] | English: | PRECONFIGURING DEDICATED RESOURCE INFORMATION IN IDLE MODE | [2021/46] | French: | PRÉCONFIGURATION D'INFORMATIONS DE RESSOURCES DÉDIÉES EN MODE VEILLE | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 23.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN103957603 (MEDIATEK INC, et al); |