EP3841245 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TREATING BIOMASS MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALMET AB 851 94 Sundsvall / SE | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHLGREN, Örjan Bergsgatan 9 852 36 Sundsvall / SE | 02 /
CARLSSON, Johan Smedsgårdsvägen 18 865 33 Alnö / SE | 03 /
LÖFSTRÖM, Anders Periskopvägen 19 856 33 Alnö / SE | 04 /
PETTERSSON, Patrik Fullriggarvägen 43 865 32 Alnö / SE | [2024/10] |
Former [2021/26] | 01 /
AHLGREN, Örjan Bergsgatan 9 852 36 SUNDSVALL / SE | ||
02 /
CARLSSON, Johan Smedsgårdsvägen 18 865 33 ALNÖ / SE | |||
03 /
LÖFSTRÖM, Anders Periskopvägen 19 856 33 ALNÖ / SE | |||
04 /
PETTERSSON, Patrik Fullriggarvägen 43 865 32 ALNÖ / SE | Representative(s) | Groth & Co. KB P.O. Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | [2021/26] | Application number, filing date | 19852122.1 | 29.05.2019 | [2021/26] | WO2019SE50500 | Priority number, date | SE20180051014 | 24.08.2018 Original published format: SE 1851014 | [2021/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020040677 | Date: | 27.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3841245 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3841245 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D21C1/04, D21C9/18, C12M1/00 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
C12P7/10 (EP,US);
D21C1/04 (EP,SE);
C12M21/12 (EP);
C12M45/06 (EP,SE);
C12P7/08 (SE);
D21C1/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/26] | D21C1/04, C12P7/08, D21C9/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BIOMASSEMATERIAL | [2021/26] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TREATING BIOMASS MATERIAL | [2021/26] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE MATÉRIAU DE BIOMASSE | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 05.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 15.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2023 | Observations by third parties | 14.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.06.2023 | Observations by third parties | 04.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 06.03.2024 | ES | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | LT | 06.03.2024 | LV | 06.03.2024 | NL | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 06.03.2024 | |
NO | 06.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2011281298 (RAWLS JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,7,10,13,14 * page 2, paragraph [0021] - page 5, paragraph [0052]; figures 1A-1B * [Y] 1-16; | [Y]WO2017088061 (IOGEN ENERGY CORP [CA]) [Y] 1-16 * page 1, paragraph [0001] * * page 29, paragraph [0090] - page 33, paragraph [00102]; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP3333310 (VALMET OY [SE]) [Y] 1-16 * column 1, paragraph [0001] * * columns 1-2, paragraph [0006] * * columns 2-3, paragraph [0010] * * column 7, paragraph [0035] * * column 10, paragraph [0053] ** column 14, paragraph [0067] - column 15, paragraph [0070]; figure 4 * | International search | [X]WO2004005608 (ANDRITZ INC [US]) [X] 1, 6-15 * ; paragraphs [0022], [0031]; figure 2 *; | [X]US2009061495 (BEATTY CHRIS [US], et al) [X] 2-14 * ; paragraphs [0006], [0030]-[0031]; figure 2 *; | [X]WO2010022511 (IOGEN ENERGY CORP [CA], et al) [X] 1, 6-15 * ; paragraphs [0010], [0014]-[0015], [0050]-[0053], [0065]-[0068], [0096]-[0100]; figure 2; claim 40 *; | [A]JP2012000022 (TSUKISHIMA KIKAI CO) [A] 3 * ; abstract *; | [A]US2012211183 (LEAVITT AARON [US], et al) [A] 4-5 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0009]-[0010], [0013] *; | [X]US2013029406 (DOTTORI FRANK A [CA], et al) [X] 1, 6-15 * ; paragraphs [0042], [0045]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2014288298 (NAKAGAME SEIJI [JP], et al) [A] 4 * ; abstract; paragraph [0123] *; | [X]WO2015199604 (VALMET OY [SE]) [X] 1, 6-15 * ; page 11, line 6 - line 8; page 13, line 25 - line 31; page 16, line 15 - line 16; page 18, line 4 - line 5; figure 6 *; | [A]US2016076198 (CHRISTENSEN KURT [US], et al) [A] 13-14, 25-26* ; paragraphs [0052]-[0072] *; | [E]EP3399095 (VALMET OY [SE]) [E] 1-2, 15-16 * ; paragraphs [0018]-[0025], [0028]-[0031]; claims 1,7-9,12 *; | [E]WO2018202673 (VALMET OY [SE]) [E] 1-2, 15-16 * abstract claims 1,7-9,11 * | Examination | US2009061495 | - Carrasco F. ET AL, "Kinetic study of dilute-acid prehydrolysis of xylan-containing biomass", Wood Science and Technology, DE, (19920301), vol. 26, no. 3, doi:10.1007/BF00224292, ISSN 0043-7719, pages 189 - 208, XP093058105 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00224292 | - DEVI ARTI ET AL, "Lignocellulosic Biomass Valorization for Bioethanol Production: a Circular Bioeconomy Approach", BIOENERGY RESEARCH, Boston, vol. 15, no. 4, doi:10.1007/s12155-022-10401-9, ISSN 1939-1234, (20220207), pages 1820 - 1841, URL: https://link.springer.com/article/10.1007/s12155-022-10401-9/fulltext.html, XP093058074 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12155-022-10401-9 | - "Kraft process: An overview", (20230702), URL: www.sciencedirect.com/topics/engineering/kraft-process | by applicant | US2011281298 | WO2017088061 | other | US2009061495 | - Devi Arti, Bajar Somvir, Kour Havleen, Kothari Richa, Pant Deepak, Singh Anita, "Lignocellulosic Biomass Valorization for Bioethanol Production: a Circular Bioeconomy Approach", BioEnergy Research, Boston , (20221201), vol. 15, no. 4, doi:10.1007/s12155-022-10401-9, ISSN 1939-1234, pages 1820 - 1841, XP093058074 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12155-022-10401-9 |