EP3840853 - APPLICATIONS OF KNOWN AND NOVEL CANNABINOIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bessor Pharma, LLC 1 Sage Lane Framingham, MA 01701 / US | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERKOWITZ, Barry, A. 1 Sage Lane Framingham, MA 01701 / US | 02 /
BARRETT, Anthony, G. Nossa Senhora De Copacabana 31, Apt. 606 22010121 Leme, Rio De Janeiro / BR | 03 /
ELLIOTT, Daniel Davidsbodenstrasse 8 4056 Basel / CH | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [2021/26] | Application number, filing date | 19852287.2 | 20.08.2019 | [2021/26] | WO2019US47284 | Priority number, date | US201862719813P | 20.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862719813 P | [2021/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020041326 | Date: | 27.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3840853 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/05, A61K31/352, A61P25/00 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
A61K31/05 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/658 (KR);
C07D311/78 (US);
A61K31/352 (EP,KR,US);
A61P29/00 (KR);
C07C37/50 (KR,US);
C07C37/56 (US);
C07C39/23 (KR,US);
C07D311/80 (KR);
C07D319/08 (US);
C07D493/04 (US);
A61K2300/00 (KR);
C07C2601/16 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/05, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/352, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
C07C37/50, C07C39/23 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/26] | B01D11/04, C07C37/00, C07C37/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Title | German: | ANWENDUNGEN VON BEKANNTEN UND NEUARTIGEN CANNABINOIDEN | [2021/26] | English: | APPLICATIONS OF KNOWN AND NOVEL CANNABINOIDS | [2021/26] | French: | APPLICATIONS DE CANNABINOÏDES CONNUS ET NOUVEAUX | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 17.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0195899 (YISSUM RES DEV CO [IL], et al); | [XI]WO2014062965 (UNIV NORTHEASTERN [US]); | [XI]WO2015198078 (GW PHARMA LTD [GB]); | [XI]WO2017072762 (YISSUM RES DEV CO [IL]); | [XPI]WO2019033164 (UNIV SYDNEY [AU]); | International search | [A]US8071641 (WEISS LOLA [IL], et al); |