EP3843176 - SLURRY COMPOSITION FOR NONAQUEOUS SECONDARY BATTERY FUNCTIONAL LAYER, FUNCTIONAL LAYER FOR NONAQUEOUS SECONDARY BATTERY, SEPARATOR FOR NONAQUEOUS SECONDARY BATTERY, AND NONAQUEOUS SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeon Corporation 6-2, Marunouchi, 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASAI, Kazuki c/o ZEON CORPORATION, 6-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/26] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19853191.5 | 15.08.2019 | [2021/26] | WO2019JP32029 | Priority number, date | JP20180157495 | 24.08.2018 Original published format: JP 2018157495 | [2021/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020040031 | Date: | 27.02.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3843176 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/449, H01M50/403, H01M50/414, H01M50/417, H01M50/423, H01M50/44, H01M50/443, H01M50/46, H01M10/0525 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR);
H01M50/411 (KR,US);
H01M4/62 (KR);
H01M4/622 (US);
H01M50/403 (EP);
H01M50/414 (EP);
H01M50/417 (EP);
H01M50/423 (EP);
H01M50/44 (EP);
H01M50/443 (EP,KR);
H01M50/449 (EP);
H01M50/461 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/26] | H01M2/16, H01M4/13, H01M4/62, H01M4/139 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Title | German: | AUFSCHLÄMMUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR FUNKTIONSSCHICHT EINER WASSERFREIEN SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, FUNKTIONSSCHICHT FÜR WASSERFREIE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, SEPARATOR FÜR WASSERFREIE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND WASSERFREIE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2021/26] | English: | SLURRY COMPOSITION FOR NONAQUEOUS SECONDARY BATTERY FUNCTIONAL LAYER, FUNCTIONAL LAYER FOR NONAQUEOUS SECONDARY BATTERY, SEPARATOR FOR NONAQUEOUS SECONDARY BATTERY, AND NONAQUEOUS SECONDARY BATTERY | [2021/26] | French: | COMPOSITION DE COULIS POUR COUCHE FONCTIONNELLE DE BATTERIE SECONDAIRE NON AQUEUSE, COUCHE FONCTIONNELLE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE NON AQUEUSE, SÉPARATEUR POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE NON AQUEUSE, ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE NON AQUEUSE | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2021 | Translation filed | 15.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 25.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP3046163 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-9 * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0090] * [A] 4; | [XA]US2016218340 (RYU BI-OH [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,5-9 * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0095]; claim all *[A] 4 | International search | [Y]WO2013141140 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * , claims, paragraph [0064], example 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2013146515 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * , claims, paragraph [0057], example 1 & US 2015/0072213 A1, claims, paragraphs [0107], [0108], example 1 & EP 2833437 A1 & CN 104170121 A & KR 10-2014-0144182 A *; | [A]JP2014044826 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-9* , claims, example 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014049354 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * , claims, example 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2015118841 (SONY CORP) [Y] 1-9 * , claims, examples 3-2, 3-5& US 2015/0179998 A1, claims, examples 3-2, 3-5 & CN 104733775 A & KR 10-2015-0072338 A *; | [A]WO2017063218 (CHINA AVIATION LITHIUM BATTERY CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-9 * , example 1 & CN 105161661 A * | by applicant | WO2015005151 | WO2015198530 |