EP3846523 - COMMUNICATION CONTROL DEVICE, COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2021/27] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku 108-0075 Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURUICHI, Sho c/o Sony Corporation, 1-7-1, Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 19853757.3 | 21.08.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019JP32721 | Priority number, date | JP20180159679 | 28.08.2018 Original published format: JP 2018159679 | [2021/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020045203 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3846523 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/14, H04W16/12, H04W72/04 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
H04W16/14 (EP);
H04W72/541 (US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04W72/27 (US);
H04W72/53 (US);
H04W16/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/27] | English: | COMMUNICATION CONTROL DEVICE, COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE | [2021/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION | [2021/27] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2021 | Translation filed | 19.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 31.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN101227698 (POTEVIO INST OF TECHNOLOGY CO [CN]); | [X]CN102118752 (CHINA MOBILE GROUP DESIGN INST); | [XI]US8811213 (RAI DEVESHKUMAR [US], et al); | [X]GB2555523 (MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS INC [US]) | International search | [XYA]JP2013078096 (SONY CORP); | [Y]WO2014006802 (NEC CORP [JP]) |