EP3843963 - ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR MAKING NON-OXIDE CERAMIC ARTICLES, AND AEROGELS, XEROGELS, AND POROUS CERAMIC ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUGHES, Gareth A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
LACKEY, Melissa A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
KOLB, Brant U. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
MAGNANT, Jerome G. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
PARKAR, Zeba 208 Creekway Court Marietta, Georgia 30066 / US | 06 /
CASEY, Kevin M. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
WREN, Nicholas S. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 19854051.0 | 22.08.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019US47604 | Priority number, date | US201862725793P | 31.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862725793 P | [2021/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020046687 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3843963 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B28B1/00, C04B35/624, C04B35/626, B29C64/153, B33Y10/00, B33Y70/10, C04B111/00, C04B35/56, C04B35/563, C04B35/583, C04B35/58, C04B35/581, C04B35/587, C04B35/622, C04B35/634, C04B35/638, C04B38/06, C04B35/565 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
C04B35/622 (EP);
C04B35/584 (US);
B28B1/001 (EP,US);
B29C64/00 (EP);
B29C64/124 (US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y70/10 (EP,US);
C04B35/5611 (EP);
C04B35/5622 (EP);
C04B35/563 (EP);
C04B35/565 (EP);
C04B35/5805 (EP);
C04B35/58071 (EP);
C04B35/58078 (EP);
C04B35/581 (EP);
C04B35/583 (EP);
C04B35/587 (EP);
C04B35/624 (EP,US);
C04B35/6264 (EP);
C04B35/62655 (US);
C04B35/63424 (EP,US);
C04B35/638 (EP);
C04B35/64 (US);
C04B38/067 (EP,US);
B29C64/153 (EP);
B29K2509/04 (US);
C04B2111/00181 (EP);
C04B2235/3201 (EP);
C04B2235/3203 (EP);
C04B2235/3206 (EP);
C04B2235/3208 (EP);
C04B2235/3213 (EP);
C04B2235/3215 (EP);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3232 (EP);
C04B2235/3244 (EP);
C04B2235/3418 (EP);
C04B2235/3821 (EP);
C04B2235/3865 (EP);
C04B2235/3873 (US);
C04B2235/402 (EP);
C04B2235/421 (EP);
C04B2235/422 (EP);
C04B2235/5436 (EP);
C04B2235/5445 (EP);
C04B2235/5454 (EP);
C04B2235/6026 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B38/067, C04B35/515 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/27] | B28B1/30, C04B35/624 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON NICHT-OXIDISCHEN KERAMISCHEN GEGENSTÄNDEN UND AEROGELEN, XEROGELEN UND PORÖSEN KERAMISCHEN GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2021/27] | English: | ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR MAKING NON-OXIDE CERAMIC ARTICLES, AND AEROGELS, XEROGELS, AND POROUS CERAMIC ARTICLES | [2021/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE POUR LA FABRICATION D'ARTICLES EN CÉRAMIQUE QUI N'EST PAS UN OXYDE ET AÉROGELS, XÉROGELS ET ARTICLES EN CÉRAMIQUE POREUSE | [2021/27] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 12.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2016191162 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [Y] 13* page 56 *; | [XAY]WO2017066584 (SAINT-GOBAIN CERAM & PLASTICS INC [US]) [X] 14,15 * example 1 * [A] 2 [Y] 1,3-8; | [XAY]CN107586136 (UNIV GUANGDONG TECHNOLOGY) [X] 14,15 * claim 1 * [A] 2 [Y] 1,3-8,13; | [YA]CN108002843 (UNIV HUAZHONG SCIENCE TECH) [Y] 1,3-8,13 * example 1; claims 1-6 * [A] 2; | [A] - LU RYAN ET AL, "Complex shaped boron carbides from negative additive manufacturing", MATERIALS & DESIGN, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20180601), vol. 148, doi:10.1016/j.matdes.2018.03.026, ISSN 0264-1275, pages 8 - 16, XP055906808 [A] 1-8 * page 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matdes.2018.03.026 | International search | [A]US6283997 (GARG RAJEEV [US], et al) [A] 1-22* , Claim 1 (Family: None) *; | [Y]CN105837219 (XI'AN BRIGHT LASER TECH LTD) [Y] 1-22 * , Abstract, [0027] (Family: None) *; | [Y]WO2016191162 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [Y] 1-22 * , Claims, p.18, p.54, p.56 & US 2018/0148378 A1 & EP 3303255 A1 & CN 107635945 A & JP 2018-524251 A *; | [Y]CN107158474 (SHANDONG RES AND DESIGN ACADEMY OF INDUSTRIAL CERAMICS CO LTD) [Y] 1-22 * , Abstract, [0010] (Family: None) *; | [Y]CN107586136 (UNIV GUANGDONG TECHNOLOGY) [Y] 1-22 * , Claim 1, Claim 4 (Family: None) * | by applicant | US3729313 | US3741769 | US3808006 | US4250053 | US4394403 | US6187833 | US2007031791 | WO2009085926 | WO2014151179 | US9205601 | US9360757 | WO2016191162 | CN108002843 |