EP3846222 - JUNCTION FIELD-EFFECT TRANSISTOR, METHOD FOR OBTAINING SAME AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consejo Superior De Investigaciones Científicas C/ Serrano 117 28006 Madrid / ES | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ULLÁN COMES, Miguel Instituto de Microelectrónica de Barcelona Campus UAB Carrer dels Til·lers 08193 Cerdanyola del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES | 02 /
COUSO FONTANILLO, Carlos Instituto de Microelectrónica de Barcelona Campus UAB Carrer dels Til·lers 08193 Cerdanyola del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES | 03 /
HIDALGO VILLENA, Salvador Instituto de Microelectrónica de Barcelona Campus UAB Carrer dels Til·lers 08193 Cerdanyola del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES | 04 /
FLORES GUAL, David Instituto de Microelectrónica de Barcelona Campus UAB Carrer dels Til·lers 08193 Cerdanyola del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES | 05 /
QUIRION, David Instituto de Microelectrónica de Barcelona Campus UAB Carrer dels Til·lers 08193 Cerdanyola del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Pons Glorieta Rubén Darío 4 28010 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2021/27] | Pons Glorieta Ruben Dario 4 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 19854146.8 | 29.08.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019ES70578 | Priority number, date | ES20180030860 | 31.08.2018 Original published format: ES 201830860 | [2021/27] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020043927 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | ES | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3846222 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 05.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/808, H01L21/337, H01L29/06, H01L29/10, H01L21/02, H01L21/70, H01L23/552, H01L29/772 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
H01L29/8083 (EP);
H01L29/772 (ES);
H01L21/02 (ES);
H01L21/70 (ES);
H01L23/552 (ES);
H01L23/585 (EP);
H01L23/62 (EP);
H01L29/0619 (EP);
H01L29/0696 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/27] | H01L29/772, H01L21/02, H01L21/70, H01L23/552 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Title | German: | SPERRSCHICHT-FELDEFFEKTTRANSISTOR, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [2021/27] | English: | JUNCTION FIELD-EFFECT TRANSISTOR, METHOD FOR OBTAINING SAME AND USE THEREOF | [2021/27] | French: | TRANSISTOR À EFFET DE CHAMP À JONCTION, SON PROCÉDÉ D'OBTENTION ET SON UTILISATION | [2021/27] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2021 | Translation filed | 02.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 04.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001332727 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2003047776 (HUETING RAYMOND J E [NL], et al) [A] 1-11* figure 11 *; | [A]JP2005286042 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2013313568 (HAYASHI HIDEKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 3 *; | [A]WO2017051051 (CONSEJO SUPERIOR DE INVESTIG CIENTÍFICAS (CSIC) [ES]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]US2017133518 (LI ZHONGDA [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 3 *; | [A] - FERNANDEZ-MARTINEZ PABLO ET AL, "A new vertical JFET technology for the powering scheme of the ATLAS upgrade inner tracker", 2016 IEEE NUCLEAR SCIENCE SYMPOSIUM, MEDICAL IMAGING CONFERENCE AND ROOM-TEMPERATURE SEMICONDUCTOR DETECTOR WORKSHOP (NSS/MIC/RTSD), IEEE, (20161029), doi:10.1109/NSSMIC.2016.8069654, pages 1 - 4, XP033228107 [A] 1-11 * figures 1,3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NSSMIC.2016.8069654 | [A] - Victor Veliadis ET AL, "Fabrication of a robust high-performance floating guard ring edge termination for power Silicon Carbide Vertical Junction Field Effect Transistors", 22nd International Conference on Compound Semiconductor Manufacturing Technology, CS MANTECH 2007, (20070101), pages 217 - 220, URL: https://pdfs.semanticscholar.org/952f/1210dd385920edcff9353d15b196403a49ef.pdf?_ga=2.252406089.1529710891.1589458046-952773486.1586340753, (20200514), XP055695510 [A] 1-11 * figures 2-4 * | International search | [A]US5963807 (UENO KATSUNORI [JP]) [A] 1-11* , column 1, lines 9-15; column 7, line 6-column 10, line 29. *; | [A]WO2017051051 (CONSEJO SUPERIOR DE INVESTIG CIENTÍFICAS (CSIC) [ES]) [A] 1-11 * , page 3, line 33-page 5, line 17; page 6, line 3-page 8, line 34; figures. *; | [A] - FERNANDEZ-MARTINEZ, P. et al., "A new vertical JFET technology for the powering scheme of the ATLAS upgrade inner tracker", 2016 IEEE Nuclear Science Symposium, Medical Imaging Conference and Room-Temperature Semiconductor Detector Workshop, NSS/MIC/RTSD 2016, (20160000), XP033228107 [A] 1-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NSSMIC.2016.8069654 | [A] - VELLVEHI, M. et al., "Failure Analysis in Power Devices using Lock-in Infrared Thermography. 2018. 19th International Conference on Thermal", 2018 19th International Conference on Thermal, Mechanical and Multi-Physics Simulation and Experiments in Microelectronics and Microsystems (EuroSimE), (20180400), pages 1 - 7, XP033351905 [A] 1-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/EuroSimE.2018.8369896 | [A] - VELIADIS, V. et al., "Fabrication of a robust high-performance floating guard ring edge termination for power Silicon Carbide Vertical Junction Field Effect Transistors", 22nd International Conference on Compound Semiconductor Manufacturing Technology, CS MANTECH 2007, vol. 2007, pages 217 - 220, URL: https://pdfs.semanticscholar.org/952f/1210dd385920edcff9353d15b196403a49ef.pdf?_ga=2.252406089.1529710891.1589458046-952773486.1586340753, (20190531), XP055695510 [A] 1-11 | by applicant | US6251716 | US6380569 | US2009075435 | US8068321 |