EP3845564 - IMPROVED THERAPEUTIC T CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immunotech Biopharm Co., Ltd. Room 204, Floor 2, Building 1-B3 No. 1 Kangding Street, BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | For all designated states Pharos Vaccine Inc. 510, 545 Dunchon-daero Jungwon-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13215 / KR | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yu 8 Floor, Building 1, Guosheng Science Park, Kangding Street No.1, BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
LEE, Hyunsoo 510, 545, Dunchon-Daero, Jungwon-Gu Seongnam-Si, Gyeonggi-Do 13215 / KR | 03 /
JUNG, Namchul 510, 545, Dunchon-Daero, Jungwon-Gu Seongnam-Si, Gyeonggi-Do 13215 / KR | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 19854222.7 | 28.04.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019CN84805 | Priority number, date | CN201810988074 | 28.08.2018 Original published format: CN201810988074 | [2021/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020042647 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3845564 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/30, C12N15/62, C07K19/00, A61P35/00 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
C07K14/71 (EP,CN,KR);
C12N5/0636 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12N15/86 (EP,CN,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K39/4631 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K39/4637 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K39/464412 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K48/00 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61P35/02 (EP,CN);
C07K14/7051 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K14/70517 (CN,KR,US);
C07K14/70578 (CN,KR,US);
C07K16/2803 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K2317/53 (KR);
C07K2317/622 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K2319/00 (CN);
C07K2319/02 (KR);
C07K2319/03 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K2319/33 (CN,US);
C07K2319/74 (CN);
C12N2501/15 (EP);
C12N2501/515 (EP);
C12N2510/00 (EP,CN,KR);
C12N2740/15043 (CN,US);
C12N2740/16043 (EP);
C12N2800/107 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE THERAPEUTISCHE T-ZELLE | [2021/27] | English: | IMPROVED THERAPEUTIC T CELL | [2021/27] | French: | LYMPHOCYTE T THÉRAPEUTIQUE AMÉLIORÉ | [2021/27] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2021 | Translation filed | 25.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 17.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2016187216 (BLUEBIRD BIO INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO2018111763 (SEATTLE CHILDRENS HOSPITAL DBA SEATTLE CHILDRENS RES INST [US]); | International search | [A]US2016151491 (RABINOVICH PETER M [US], et al); | [A]US2016228547 (WAGNER SAMUEL C [US], et al); | [A]CN107949400 (SIGMA ALDRICH CO LLC); |