EP3840725 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS TO INCREASE HAIR GROWTH AND/OR PREVENT HAIR LOSS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Attain Health Inc. PO Box 892 Dalton, GA 30722 / US | [2024/27] |
Former [2021/26] | For all designated states Hair Plus Health LLC P.O. Box 892 Dalton, Georgia 30722 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMARIN, Seymour Aaron P.O. Box 892 Dalton, Georgia 30722 / US | 02 /
RICHARDS, James William 410 Carter Stealey Road Chatsworth, Georgia 30705 / US | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/26] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 19854761.4 | 26.08.2019 | [2021/26] | WO2019US48156 | Priority number, date | US201862722980P | 26.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862722980 P | [2021/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020046820 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3840725 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/362, A61Q5/00, A61Q7/00, A61K8/49, A61K8/69, A61K8/63 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
A61Q7/00 (EP);
A61K31/506 (US);
A61K31/194 (US);
A61K31/58 (US);
A61K47/14 (US);
A61K47/24 (US);
A61K8/362 (EP);
A61K8/4953 (EP);
A61K8/63 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/26] | A61K8/36, A61Q5/00, A61Q7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR FÖRDERUNG DES HAARWUCHSES UND/ODER ZUR VORBEUGUNG VON HAARAUSFALL | [2021/26] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS TO INCREASE HAIR GROWTH AND/OR PREVENT HAIR LOSS | [2021/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR RENFORCER LA CROISSANCE DES CHEVEUX ET/OU PRÉVENIR LA CHUTE DES CHEVEUX | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 11.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 21.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 21.03.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 21.03.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.03.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008152731 (TRIGIANTE GIUSEPPE [IT]); | [Y]WO2014184173 (MONTERO GIDA SANAYI VE TICARET AS [TR]); | [Y]US2016346183 (SEKHAVAT HOUFAR [CA]); | [Y]CA3036692 (CDA RES GROUP INC [US]); | [Y]WO2018151838 (MAYO FOUND MEDICAL EDUCATION & RES [US]) | International search | [XY]US2002119174 (GARDLIK JOHN MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]WO2006096461 (PHARMACIA & UPJOHN CO LLC [US], et al); | [A]US2007086972 (BIRNBAUM JACOB [US]); | [A]US2012258059 (IWAMA TAKEHISA [JP], et al); | [A]US2014377384 (TRIGIANTE GIUSEPPE [GB]); | [Y]US2017181948 (WU JEFFREY M [US]); | [A]US2018193236 (SON SEONG KIL [KR], et al) |