EP3844073 - A COMPOSITE CONTAINER WITH SEPARABLE TOP, A BODY BLANK, AND A METHOD OF SEPARATING A TOP END PORTION FROM A MAIN BODY OF THE CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AR Packaging Systems AB Box 177 221 00 Lund / SE | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNNING, Eva Saxtorpsvägen 189A 261 94 Annelöv / SE | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 19854954.5 | 29.08.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019SE50809 | Priority number, date | SE20180051035 | 31.08.2018 Original published format: SE 1851035 | [2021/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020046196 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3844073 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/54, B65D3/22, B65D3/26, B65D5/02 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
B65D3/263 (EP,US);
B65D5/5445 (SE);
B65D15/08 (SE,US);
B65D3/02 (US);
B65D3/262 (EP,SE);
B65D5/542 (EP,SE);
B65D65/40 (US);
B65D77/2004 (US);
B65D77/32 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Title | German: | VERBUNDBEHÄLTER MIT ABTRENNBAREM OBERTEIL, KÖRPERZUSCHNITT UND VERFAHREN ZUM TRENNEN EINES OBEREN ENDABSCHNITTS VON EINEM HAUPTKÖRPER DES BEHÄLTERS | [2021/27] | English: | A COMPOSITE CONTAINER WITH SEPARABLE TOP, A BODY BLANK, AND A METHOD OF SEPARATING A TOP END PORTION FROM A MAIN BODY OF THE CONTAINER | [2021/27] | French: | CONTENANT COMPOSITE DOTÉ D'UNE PARTIE D'EXTRÉMITÉ SUPÉRIEURE AMOVIBLE, DÉCOUPE DE CORPS ET PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION D'UNE PARTIE D'EXTRÉMITÉ SUPÉRIEURE D'UN CORPS PRINCIPAL DU CONTENANT | [2024/26] |
Former [2021/27] | CONTENANT COMPOSITE DOTÉ D'UN SOMMET AMOVIBLE, DÉCOUPE DE CORPS ET PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION D'UNE PARTIE D'EXTRÉMITÉ SUPÉRIEURE D'UN CORPS PRINCIPAL DU CONTENANT D'UN CONTENANT COMPOSITE DOTÉ D'UN SOMMET AMOVIBLE, DÉCOUPE DE CORPS ET PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION D'UNE PARTIE D'EXTRÉMITÉ SUPÉRIEURE D'UN CORPS PRINCIPAL DU CONTENANT | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 23.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US3409206 (SLOUKA DONALD G, et al); | [YA]US2005189406 (WELCHEL DEBRA N [US], et al) | International search | [A]US4621736 (ROCCAFORTE HARRY I [US]); | [A]US5641118 (BENHAM ALBERT A [US]); | [A]JP3025434B ; | [A]JP2004155478 (KIRIN BREWERY); | [A]JP2004315094 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]WO2005032959 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH], et al); | [A]JP3843510B ; | [A]US2013186901 (LEJON HANNA [SE], et al); | [A]JP2016084169 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]WO2016126193 (Å&R CARTON LUND AKTIEBOLAG [SE]); | [A]US2018194527 (SASAKI NORIYUKI [JP], et al) |