EP3843642 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR LARGE SPOT RETINAL LASER TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iridex Corporation 1212 Terra Bella Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Howard c/o Iridex Corporation 1212 Terra Bella Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
MARCELLINO, George c/o Iridex Corporation 1212 Terra Bella Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 19855193.9 | 30.08.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019US49107 | Priority number, date | US201862725571P | 31.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862725571 P | [2021/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020047436 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3843642 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B18/08, A61F9/007, A61F9/008, A61N5/06 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
A61F9/008 (EP,US);
A61B5/398 (EP,US);
A61F2009/00844 (EP);
A61F2009/00851 (US);
A61F2009/00863 (EP,US);
A61F2009/00891 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR LARGE-SPOT-LASERBEHANDLUNG DER NETZHAUT | [2021/27] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR LARGE SPOT RETINAL LASER TREATMENT | [2021/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE TRAITEMENT LASER RÉTINIEN À POINT LARGE | [2021/27] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 07.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008015553 (ZACHARIAS JAIME [US]); | [Y]US2013085481 (DICK MANFRED [DE], et al); | [A]US2013110206 (YEE KINGMAN [US], et al); | [XY]US2013317570 (LUTTRULL JEFFREY K [US], et al); | [X]US2016262933 (BLUMENKRANZ MARK [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US6743221 (HOBART JAMES L [US], et al); | [Y]US2005070896 (DANIEL STEVEN A [US], et al); | [XY]US2013110206 (YEE KINGMAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2014005756 (LIU HARVEY I-HENG [US], et al); | [A]US2014328461 (GERTNER MICHAEL [US], et al) | by applicant | US2008015553 | US2013317570 | US2016262933 |