EP3844132 - PROCESS FOR BIOLOGICAL AMMONIA PRODUCTION BY NITROGEN FIXING CYANOBACTERIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Growponics Greenhouse Technology Ltd. 14 Landauer St. 2703309 Kiryat Bialik / IL | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESSEL, Lior 14 Landauer Street 2703309 Kiryat Bialik / IL | 02 /
SHEMESH, Assaf 5 Michal Street 3436207 Haifa / IL | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Kancelaria Eupatent.pl Sp. z.o.o Ul. Kilinskiego 185 90-348 Lodz / PL | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 19855460.2 | 29.08.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019IB57284 | Priority number, date | US201862724457P | 29.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862724457 P | [2021/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020044279 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3844132 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 05.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12P3/00, C05C3/00, C05G5/23, C12N1/20, C12R1/01, C12N11/02, C12N11/08, C12N11/14, C12M1/00 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
C05C3/00 (EP,US);
C05F11/08 (US);
C05G5/23 (EP,US);
C12M21/02 (EP);
C12M23/18 (EP);
C12M29/06 (EP);
C12M29/26 (EP);
C12M41/26 (EP);
C12N1/20 (EP,US);
C12N11/02 (EP);
C12N11/08 (EP);
C12N11/14 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/27] | C05F11/08, C12N1/20, C12R1/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BIOLOGISCHEN AMMONIAKHERSTELLUNG DURCH STICKSTOFFFIXIERUNG VIN CYANOBAKTERIEN | [2021/27] | English: | PROCESS FOR BIOLOGICAL AMMONIA PRODUCTION BY NITROGEN FIXING CYANOBACTERIA | [2021/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION BIOLOGIQUE D'AMMONIAC PAR DES CYANOBACTÉRIES FIXANT L'AZOTE | [2021/27] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 29.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - GRIZEAU D. ET AL, "Ammonium photo-production by heterocytous cyanobacteria: potentials and constraints", CRITICAL REVIEWS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, US, (20150123), vol. 36, no. 4, doi:10.3109/07388551.2014.1002380, ISSN 0738-8551, pages 607 - 618, XP055697291 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/07388551.2014.1002380 | [X] - BROUERS M. ET AL, "Ammonia and hydrogen production by immobilized cyanobacteria", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 3, no. 5-6, doi:10.1016/0168-1656(86)90012-X, ISSN 0168-1656, (19860401), pages 307 - 321, (19860401), XP023944239 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-1656(86)90012-X | [X] - BUI L. A. ET AL, "Isolation, improvement and characterization of an ammonium excreting mutant strain of the heterocytous cyanobacterium, Anabaena variabilis PCC 7937", BIOCHEMICAL ENGINEERING JOURNAL, (20140628), vol. 90, doi:10.1016/J.BEJ.2014.06.016, ISSN 1369-703X, pages 279 - 285, XP029011224 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bej.2014.06.016 | International search | [X]WO2018132774 (PIVOT BIO INC [US]) [X] 1-44 * [0095], [0096], [0124], [0148], [0207], [0240], [0248], [0340]-[0342] *; | [X] - GRIZEAU D. et al., "Ammonium photo-production by heterocytous cyanobacteria: potentials and constraints", Crit. Rev. Biotechnol., (20150131), XP055697291 [X] 1-44 * p. 2-7, p. 8 col. 2, p. 9, p. 10, * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/07388551.2014.1002380 | [X] - MICHEL BROUERS et al., "Ammonia and hydrogen production by immobilized cyanobacteria", Journal of Biofechnology, (19861231), vol. 3, doi:10.1016/0168-1656(86)90012-X, pages 307 - 321, XP023944239 [X] 1-47 * summary, p. 309 1st, 2nd, 3rd par., materials and methods * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-1656(86)90012-X |