EP3797517 - AN ENCODER, A DECODER AND CORRESPONDING METHODS USING A PALETTE CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHERNYAK, Roman 1, Altufievskoe Shosse Moscow, 127106 / RU | 02 /
IKONIN, Sergey Yurievich 1, Altufievskoe Shosse Moscow, 127106 / RU | 03 /
CHEN, Jianle 2330 Central Expressway Santa Clara, California 95050 / US | [2023/33] |
Former [2021/13] | 01 /
CHERNYAK, Roman 1, Altufievskoe SHosse Moscow, 127106 / RU | ||
02 /
IKONIN, Sergey Yurievich 1, Altufievskoe SHosse Moscow, 127106 / RU | |||
03 /
CHEN, Jianle 2330 Central Expressway Santa Clara, California 95050 / US | Representative(s) | Huawei European IPR Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | [2023/33] |
Former [2021/13] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19855851.2 | 30.08.2019 | [2021/13] | WO2019CN103754 | Priority number, date | US201862725132P | 30.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862725132 P | US201862784537P | 23.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862784537 P | US201862786314P | 28.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862786314 P | [2021/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020043194 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3797517 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3797517 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/96, H04N19/119, H04N19/186, H04N19/463, H04N19/70 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
H04N19/119 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H04N19/186 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
H04N19/96 (EP,CN,IL);
H04N19/176 (EP,CN,IL,US);
H04N19/184 (IL,KR,US);
H04N19/44 (IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/13] | H04N19/96 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CODIERER, DECODIERER UND ENTSPRECHENDE VERFAHREN MITTELS PALETTENCODIERUNG | [2021/13] | English: | AN ENCODER, A DECODER AND CORRESPONDING METHODS USING A PALETTE CODING | [2021/13] | French: | CODEUR, DÉCODEUR ET PROCÉDÉS CORRESPONDANTS UTILISANT UN CODAGE DE PALETTE | [2021/13] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 23.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | MC | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | LU | 30.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 30.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - BENJAMIN BROSS ET AL, "Versatile Video Coding (Draft 2)", no. JVET-K1001-v4; JVET-K1001, (20180817), pages 1 - 85, 11. JVET MEETING; 20180711 - 20180718; LJUBLJANA; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/11_Ljubljana/wg11/JVET-K1001-v4.zip JVET-K1001-v4.docx, XP030193545 [X] 1,11-13,17 * page 43, paragraph 8.2.1 - page 47, paragraph 8.2.4 * [A] 2-10,14-16 | [XA] - T-D CHUANG ET AL, "CE1-related: Separate tree partitioning at 64x64-luma/32x32-chroma unit level", no. m43159, (20180717), 123. MPEG MEETING; 20180716 - 20180720; LJUBLJANA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/123_Ljubljana/wg11/m43159-JVET-K0230-v4-JVET-K0230-v4.zip JVET-K0230-v1.docx, (20180717), XP030197456 [X] 1,11-13,17 * page 2 - page 3; figures 2-4 * [A] 2-10,14-16 | [XP] - CHERNYAK (HUAWEI) R ET AL, "CE15-related: Separate Palette Coding for Luma and Chroma components", no. JVET-L0427, (20180925), 12. JVET MEETING; 20181003 - 20181012; MACAO; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/12_Macao/wg11/JVET-L0427-v1.zip JVET-L0427-v1.docx, (20180925), XP030193920 [XP] 1-17 * Proposed method; page 1, paragraph 1; figure 1 * |