EP3848839 - INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2021/28] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku 108-0075 Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIMARU, Mikio c/o Sony Corporation, 1-7-1, Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
ENDO, Kenta c/o Sony Corporation, 1-7-1, Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstraße 62 80799 München / DE | [2021/28] | Application number, filing date | 19856653.1 | 09.08.2019 | [2021/28] | WO2019JP31661 | Priority number, date | JP20180167374 | 06.09.2018 Original published format: JP 2018167374 | [2021/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020049958 | Date: | 12.03.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3848839 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/62 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
G06F21/6209 (EP,US);
G06F21/6245 (US);
G06F21/84 (US);
G06T7/70 (US);
H04N23/80 (US);
H04N5/913 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, ENDGERÄT UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/28] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE | [2021/28] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, DISPOSITIF DE TERMINAL, ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2021/28] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2021 | Translation filed | 01.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 15.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017372046 (THOMEE BART [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0106] * * paragraph [0112] * * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0117] * * paragraph [0120] * * paragraph [0123] * * paragraph [0127] * * paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0130] * * paragraph [0132] * * paragraph [0134] * * figures 4A-C, 5, 6 *; | [I]WO2018060863 (PARIKH VARSHA [IN]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [00024] - paragraph [00025] * * paragraph [00033] * * paragraph [00053] - paragraph [00054] * * paragraph [00056] * * paragraph [00076] * * figures 1, 4, 5 *; | [A]US2018189461 (GHAFOURIFAR ALSTON [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0047] ** figures 3A-B, 8A-C * | International search | [Y]JP2006319775 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 3, 14 * , paragraphs [0029], [0037] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2009033738 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 2, 13 * , paragraphs [0033]-[0088], [0100]-[0121], fig. 11 & US 2009/0010570 A1, paragraphs [0050]-[0113], [0125]-[0146], fig. 11 *; | [XY]JP2015184909 (CANON KK) [X] 1, 5-12, 16-18 * , paragraphs [0009]-[0024] (Family: none) * [Y] 2-4, 13-15; | [Y]JP2017184120 (MEDI PLUS CO LTD) [Y] 4, 15 * , paragraphs [0012]-[0035] (Family: none) *; | [Y]US2018189461 (GHAFOURIFAR ALSTON [US], et al) [Y] 3, 14 * , paragraphs [0044]-[0049], fig. 3A (Family: none) *; | [PX]JP2019050553 (CANON KK) [PX] 1, 4-12, 15-18* , paragraphs [0011]-[0062], fig. 5-9 & US 2019/0073813 A1, paragraphs [0023]-[0074], fig. 5-9 & EP 3454254 A1 * | by applicant | JP2009194687 |