EP3848134 - SILVER NANOPARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osaka Soda Co., Ltd. 12-18, Awaza 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 550-0011 / JP | [2021/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORI, Takamichi c/o OSAKA SODA CO., LTD. 12-18, Awaza 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0011 / JP | 02 /
MINAMI, Junichiro c/o OSAKA SODA CO., LTD. 12-18, Awaza 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0011 / JP | 03 /
IWASA, Naruhito c/o OSAKA SODA CO., LTD. 12-18, Awaza 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0011 / JP | 04 /
OKUDA, Masatoshi c/o OSAKA SODA CO., LTD. 12-18, Awaza 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0011 / JP | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2021/28] | Application number, filing date | 19857559.9 | 02.09.2019 | [2021/28] | WO2019JP34347 | Priority number, date | JP20180164872 | 03.09.2018 Original published format: JP 2018164872 | [2021/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020050194 | Date: | 12.03.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3848134 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B22F1/00, B22F7/06, B22F7/08 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
B22F7/08 (EP,US);
B22F1/05 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/0545 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/07 (KR,US);
B22F1/102 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/148 (EP,KR,US);
B22F7/064 (EP);
C09J11/04 (US);
C09J9/02 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/28] | B22F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] | Title | German: | SILBERNANOPARTIKEL | [2021/28] | English: | SILVER NANOPARTICLES | [2021/28] | French: | NANOPARTICULES D'ARGENT | [2021/28] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2021 | Translation filed | 04.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 02.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2016121432 (WATANABE TOMOFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0119] - [0125]; example 1 ** figures 2,3 * | International search | [X]JP2017066501 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-5* , claims, paragraph [0067] (Family: none) * | by applicant | WO2010018712 | JP5574761B | JP2015159096 |