EP3848101 - SYSTEM FOR MANAGING GAMING TOKEN MONEY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Angel Playing Cards Co., Ltd. 4600 Aono-cho Higashiomi-shi Shiga 527-0232 / JP | [2021/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIGETA, Yasushi c/o ANGEL PLAYING CARDS CO., LTD., 4600, Aono-cho Higashiomi-shi, Shiga 527-0232 / JP | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2021/28] | Application number, filing date | 19858374.2 | 26.08.2019 | [2021/28] | WO2019JP33301 | Priority number, date | JP20180182857 | 06.09.2018 Original published format: JP 2018182857 | [2021/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020050088 | Date: | 12.03.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3848101 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3848101 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A44C21/00, G07F17/32, A63F3/00, // A63F9/24 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
A63F3/00697 (EP,CN);
G07F17/3223 (KR);
G07F17/3234 (EP,CN);
G07F17/3251 (US);
A44C21/00 (EP,CN);
A63F3/00157 (EP);
G06K19/047 (KR);
G06K19/0723 (KR,US);
G06K19/07722 (US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G07F17/3241 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G07F17/3244 (EP,CN);
G07F17/3248 (KR);
A63F2003/00703 (EP,CN);
A63F2003/00845 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2021/28] | A63F9/00, A44C21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VERWALTUNG VON SPIELMARKENGELD FÜR GAMING | [2021/28] | English: | SYSTEM FOR MANAGING GAMING TOKEN MONEY | [2021/28] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE MONNAIE-JETON DE JEU | [2021/28] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2021 | Translation filed | 24.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 17.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24168737.5 / EP4371632 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015018083 (CZYZEWSKI ZBIGNIEW [US], et al); | [XAY]WO2018147451 (ANGEL PLAYING CARDS CO LTD [JP]) | International search | [Y]WO03030097 (NHK SPRING CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2018079311 (ANGEL PLAYING CARDS CO LTD) | Examination | WO03030097 | by applicant | WO2017135103 | JP2018182857 |