EP3850852 - TILE BASED ADDRESSING IN VIDEO CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Ye-Kui 6264 Sunrose Crest Way San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
HENDRY, Fnu 8584 Foxcroft Place San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Jianle 10756 Corte De Tiburon San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Roth, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/29] | Roth, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19859301.4 | 13.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019US51149 | Priority number, date | US201862731696P | 14.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862731696 P | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020056354 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3850852 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/70, H04N19/13, H04N19/36, H04N19/30 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
H04N19/436 (EP,CN);
H04N19/70 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/96 (CN,US);
H04N19/119 (CN,KR,US);
H04N19/174 (CN,KR,US);
H04N19/176 (CN,US);
H04N19/184 (CN,US);
H04N19/188 (KR);
H04N19/1883 (CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/29] | H04N19/70, H04N19/13, H04N19/436, H04N19/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | KACHELBASIERTE ADRESSIERUNG IN DER VIDEOCODIERUNG | [2021/29] | English: | TILE BASED ADDRESSING IN VIDEO CODING | [2021/29] | French: | ADRESSAGE BASÉ SUR DES PAVÉS DANS LE CODAGE VIDÉO | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 16.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 15.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2772055 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | International search | [A]US2015016503 (RAPAKA KRISHNAKANTH [US], et al); | [A]US2015146794 (HOANG DZUNG [US]); | [A]US2015208095 (SCHIERL THOMAS [DE], et al); | [A]US2016330255 (DENOUAL FRANCK [FR], et al); | [A]US2016353128 (WOZNIAK MATTHEW [US], et al); | [XA]US2017289556 (HENDRY FNU [US], et al); | [A]US2018242028 (VAN BRANDENBURG RAY [NL], et al) | by applicant | EP2772055 |