EP3852066 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA ENCODING METHOD, THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA DECODING METHOD, THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA ENCODING DEVICE, AND THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA DECODING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Chung Dean c/o Panasonic R&D Center Singapore 202 Bedok South Avenue 1 02-11 Singapore 469332 / SG | 02 /
LASANG, Pongsak c/o Panasonic R&D Center Singapore 202 Bedok South Avenue 1 02-11 Singapore 469332 / SG | 03 /
WANG, Chi c/o Panasonic R&D Center Singapore 202 Bedok South Avenue 1 02-11 Singapore 469332 / SG | 04 /
IGUCHI, Noritaka c/o Panasonic Int. Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaki-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
SUGIO, Toshiyasu c/o Panasonic Int. Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 19859655.3 | 10.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019JP35595 | Priority number, date | US201862729712P | 11.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862729712 P | US201862731281P | 14.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862731281 P | [2021/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020054739 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3852066 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/124, H04N19/186, G06T9/00 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
H04N19/124 (EP,US);
G06T9/00 (EP,KR);
H04N19/186 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/29] | G06T9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR CODIERUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER DATEN, VERFAHREN ZUR DECODIERUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER DATEN, VORRICHTUNG ZUR CODIERUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER DATEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DECODIERUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER DATEN | [2021/29] | English: | THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA ENCODING METHOD, THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA DECODING METHOD, THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA ENCODING DEVICE, AND THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA DECODING DEVICE | [2021/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE DE DONNÉES TRIDIMENSIONNELLES, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE DE DONNÉES TRIDIMENSIONNELLES, DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE DE DONNÉES TRIDIMENSIONNELLES ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉCODAGE DE DONNÉES TRIDIMENSIONNELLES | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2021 | Translation filed | 01.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 20.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2014286436 (SATO KAZUSHI [JP]); | [Y]US2015319438 (SHIMA MASATO [JP], et al); | International search | [A]JP2006108792 (FUKUOKA PREF GOV SANGYO KAGAKU, et al); | [YA]WO2013108688 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [YA]JP2014116733 (CANON KK); | [YA]WO2018083999 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]); | [Y]JP2018078503 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) | by applicant | WO2014020663 |