EP3840304 - COMMUNICATION METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Bingshe Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
HU, Chongyang Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 19859970.6 | 21.08.2019 | [2021/25] | WO2019CN101674 | Priority number, date | CN20181177544 | 15.09.2018 Original published format: CN201811077544 | [2021/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020052410 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3840304 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3840304 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L45/00, H04L45/02, H04L45/033, H04L69/22, H04L69/06, H04L12/46 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
H04L69/22 (EP,CN);
H04L12/4641 (CN,US);
H04L45/04 (EP,US);
H04L45/02 (US);
H04L45/033 (EP,CN);
H04L45/20 (US);
H04L45/50 (US);
H04L45/566 (EP);
H04L45/66 (EP);
H04L45/745 (US);
H04L69/06 (EP,CN);
H04L12/4645 (EP);
H04L2012/4629 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/41] | H04L12/46, H04L29/06, H04L12/721 | ||
Former IPC [2021/25] | H04L12/46, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM | [2021/25] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM | [2021/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2021 | Translation filed | 19.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 11.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |