EP3852249 - MOLDED MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMAYA, Takanori c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
NANBU, Yasuo c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 19860332.6 | 10.07.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019JP27258 | Priority number, date | JP20180170912 | 12.09.2018 Original published format: JP 2018170912 | [2021/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020054199 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3852249 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/22, H02K5/08, H02K5/15, H02K5/173 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
H02K5/15 (EP);
H02K5/08 (EP);
H02K5/1732 (EP);
H02K5/225 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/29] | H02K5/22, H02K5/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | GEFORMTER MOTOR | [2021/29] | English: | MOLDED MOTOR | [2021/29] | French: | MOTEUR MOULÉ | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2021 | Translation filed | 12.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 20.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB801224 (PLESSEY CO LTD) [A] 7-9 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2000120512 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] *; | [Y]JP2003032934 (JAPAN ATOMIC ENERGY RES INST) [Y] 7-9 * abstract *; | [A]JP2014039421 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-9* abstract *; | [Y]JP6202173B (DAIKIN IND LTD) [Y] 1-9 * abstract *; | [P]EP3386076 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [P] * abstract * | International search | [YA]JPS534201U [Y] 1-3, 5- 6, 8-9 * , * [A] 4, 7; | [YA]JPH11196547 (SANSO ELEC MFG) [Y] 1-3, 5- 9 * , * [A] 4; | [Y]JPH11206059 (SHIBAURA MECHATRONICS CORP) [Y] 9 * , *; | [A]JP2000120512 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-9 * , *; | [Y]JP2003032934 (JAPAN ATOMIC ENERGY RES INST) [Y] 7-9 * , *; | [A]JP2015133861 (TAMAGAWA SEIKI CO LTD) [A] 1-9* , * | by applicant | JP2004143368 | WO2012101976 |