EP3827829 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING NONALCOHOLIC FATTY LIVER DISEASE, CONTAINING GPR119 LIGAND AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | 27.09.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dong-A ST Co., Ltd. 64 Cheonho-daero Dongdaemun-gu Seoul 02587 / KR | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Mi-Kyung 6121-2204, 76, Central town-ro Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-Si Gyeonggi-do 16505 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Bo Ram 107-1602, 7-10, Poeun-daero 313beon-gil Suji-Gu Yongin-Si Gyeonggi-do 16846 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Hansu 104-1402, 112, Yeongtong-ro 200beon-gil Yeongtong- Gu Suwon-Si Gyeonggi-do 16693 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Seung Ho 103-301, 16, Giheungyeok-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-Si Gyeonggi-do 17066 / KR | 05 /
CHAE, Yu Na 306-901, 220, Seongbok 2-ro Suji-Gu Yongin-Si Gyeonggi-do 16807 / KR | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/22] | Application number, filing date | 19860397.9 | 11.09.2019 | [2021/22] | WO2019KR11839 | Priority number, date | KR20180109219 | 12.09.2018 Original published format: KR 20180109219 | [2021/22] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020055170 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3827829 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/506, A61K31/497, A61K31/4439, A61K31/4245, A61K31/425, A61K31/433, A61K31/454, A61K31/4545, A61P1/16 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
A61K31/4245 (EP,IL);
A61K31/445 (IL,KR,RU);
A61K31/506 (EP,IL,US);
A23L33/10 (IL,US);
A61K31/425 (EP,IL);
A61K31/433 (EP,IL);
A61K31/4439 (EP,IL);
A61K31/4523 (IL,KR);
A61K31/454 (EP,IL,RU);
A61K31/4545 (EP,IL);
A61K31/497 (EP,IL);
A61P1/06 (IL,US);
A61P1/16 (EP,IL,KR,RU)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/22] | A61K31/445, A61K31/4523, A61P1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT GPR119-LIGANDEN ALS WIRKSTOFF ZUR VORBEUGUNG ODER BEHANDLUNG VON NICHTALKOHOLISCHER FETTLEBERERKRANKUNG | [2021/22] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING NONALCOHOLIC FATTY LIVER DISEASE, CONTAINING GPR119 LIGAND AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT | [2021/22] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE PERMETTANT DE PRÉVENIR OU DE TRAITER UNE STÉATOSE HÉPATIQUE NON ALCOOLIQUE, CONTENANT UN LIGAND DE GPR119 COMME PRINCIPE ACTIF | [2021/22] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2021 | Translation filed | 26.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 23.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2017049773 (KANG KEON WOOK [KR], et al); | [Y]EP3212640 (DONG A ST CO LTD [KR]); | International search | [A]US2011212939 (BERTRAM LISA SARAH [GB], et al); | [A]KR20150018916 ; | [A]KR20150088204 (UNIV DONGGUK IND ACAD COOP [KR], et al); | [A]KR20160049434 (DONG A ST CO LTD [KR]); |