EP3849775 - SIZER FOR AN EXTRUSION MACHINE WITH IMPROVED COOLING AND VACUUM CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Engineered Profiles LLC 2141 Fairwood Avenue Columbus, OH 43207 / US | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DHANAPAL, Vickram 200 Kitdare Drive Delaware, OH 43015 / US | 02 /
ONEY, Gary 29952 Beech Grove Road Londonderry, OH 45647 / US | 03 /
MAY, Roger 6640 Cincinnati-Zanesville Road Lancaster, OH 43130 / US | 04 /
KIMMES, Troy 10347 Shipley Road Johnstown, OH 43031 / US | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Wynne-Jones IP Limited Office 3.17 The Maltings East Tyndall Street Cardiff CF24 5EA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/29] | Wynne-Jones IP Limited Office 3.3 The Maltings East Tyndall Street Cardiff CF24 5EZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19860428.2 | 10.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019US50348 | Priority number, date | US201862729789P | 11.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862729789 P | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020055823 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3849775 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29C48/90, B29C48/88, B29C48/25, // B29C48/12, B29C48/11 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
B29C48/908 (EP);
B29C48/903 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/131 (EP);
B29C48/251 (EP);
B29C48/904 (EP,US);
B29C48/913 (US);
B29C48/916 (US);
B29C48/12 (EP,US);
B29C48/256 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/29] | B29C48/90, B29C48/88, B29C48/11 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE EXTRUSIONSMASCHINE MIT VERBESSERTEN KÜHL- UND VAKUUMKANÄLEN | [2021/29] | English: | SIZER FOR AN EXTRUSION MACHINE WITH IMPROVED COOLING AND VACUUM CHANNELS | [2021/29] | French: | CALIBREUR POUR UNE MACHINE D'EXTRUSION AYANT DES CANAUX DE REFROIDISSEMENT ET DE VIDE AMÉLIORÉS | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 09.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE19854932 (HIENDL GMBH & CO KG H [DE]) [Y] 4 * figures 1-6 *[A] 11-15; | [XYI]CN202241940U (TRINITY ELECTRONIC GROUP LTD CO) [X] 1,2,5-8,10 * abstract * * claims 1-10 * * figures 1-6 * [Y] 4,9 [I] 3; | [Y]US9056419 (BELL RICHARD C [US], et al) [Y] 4,9 * column 7, lines 20-25 * * figure 3 *; | [XP]CN109605700 (SHANDONG TAIJILONG ALWAYSEAL TECH LTD, et al) [XP] 1,2,5-8,10 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * | International search | [A]US4401424 (DE ZEN VITTORIO [CA]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US5288218 (MELKONIAN GEORGE [US]) [Y] 8-11, 15, 20 * entire document *; | [XY]US6200119 (PELTO WALTER [US], et al) [X] 1 * entire document * [Y] 2-11, 15, 20; | [Y]US2001018078 (KOSSL REINHOLD [AT]) [Y] 2-11, 15, 20 * entire document *; | [A]US2001043963 (ZHANG MING [CN], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [A]US2014291886 (MARK GREGORY THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document * | by applicant | DE19854932 | CN202241940U | US9056419 |