EP3851436 - NOVEL HETEROAROMATIC AMIDE DERIVATIVE AND MEDICINE CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaken Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 28-8, Honkomagome 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8650 / JP | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKAHOSHI Issei c/o KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., Drug Research Center, 14, Shinomiyaminamigawara-cho, Yamashina- ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | 02 /
SUMIKAWA Yoshitake c/o KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., Drug Research Center, 14, Shinomiyaminamigawara-cho, Yamashina- ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | 03 /
FURUTA Sadayoshi c/o KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., 28-8, Honkomagome 2-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8650 / JP | 04 /
FUKUSHIMA Keiichiro c/o KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., Drug Research Center, 14, Shinomiyaminamigawara-cho, Yamashina- ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | 05 /
IMAZU Takuya c/o KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., Drug Research Center, 14, Shinomiyaminamigawara-cho, Yamashina- ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | 06 /
KOTAKA Ryota c/o KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., Drug Research Center, 14, Shinomiyaminamigawara-cho, Yamashina- ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 607-8042 / JP | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2024/24] |
Former [2021/29] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19860719.4 | 09.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019JP35354 | Priority number, date | JP20180169104 | 10.09.2018 Original published format: JP 2018169104 | [2021/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020054657 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3851436 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3851436 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/424, A61K31/437, A61K31/4439, A61K31/444, A61K31/454, A61K31/497, A61K31/4985, A61K31/506, A61K31/519, A61K31/5365, A61K31/5377, A61K31/5383, A61K31/553, A61P17/04, A61P25/00, A61P25/02, A61P25/04, A61P29/00, A61P43/00, C07D487/04 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
A61P17/04 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/424 (IL);
C07D471/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/437 (IL,KR);
A61K31/4439 (IL);
A61K31/444 (IL);
A61K31/454 (IL);
A61K31/496 (KR);
A61K31/497 (IL);
A61K31/4985 (IL,KR);
A61K31/506 (IL);
A61K31/519 (IL);
A61K31/5365 (IL,KR);
A61K31/5377 (IL);
A61K31/5383 (IL);
A61K31/553 (IL,KR);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P25/02 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P25/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P43/00 (IL);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUARTIGES HETEROAROMATISCHES AMIDDERIVAT UND MEDIZIN DAMIT | [2021/29] | English: | NOVEL HETEROAROMATIC AMIDE DERIVATIVE AND MEDICINE CONTAINING SAME | [2021/29] | French: | DÉRIVÉ D'AMIDE HÉTÉROAROMATIQUE ET MÉDICAMENT LE CONTENANT | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2021 | Translation filed | 10.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 12.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2009145720 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al); | [AD]WO2016117647 (SUMITOMO DAINIPPON PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) | International search | [A]US2009186902 (MERLA BEATRIX [DE], et al); | [A]JP2016526571 ; | [X]WO2017004500 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2017145013 (PFIZER [US]); | [X]WO2018109097 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) | by applicant | WO2008008020 | WO2008130319 | WO2008130320 | WO2008130321 | WO2008130322 | WO2008130323 | US2009186902 | WO2009145720 | WO2009145721 | WO2012039657 | WO2013161928 | JP2014101287 | WO2014151472 | US8883840 | WO2015119998 | WO2016117647 | WO2017145013 |