EP3850888 - RESOURCE DEPLOYMENT OPTIMIZER FOR NON-GEOSTATIONARY AND/OR GEOSTATIONARY COMMUNICATIONS SATELLITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telesat Technology Corporation 160 Elgin St., Suite 2100 Ottawa ON K2P 2P7 / CA | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOINIÈRE, Eric 2346 Raintree Drive Ottawa, Ontario K1W 1J3 / CA | 02 /
MINHAS, Rahul 92 Gilmour Street Ottawa, Ontario K2P 0N6 / CA | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 19860819.2 | 10.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019CA51267 | Priority number, date | CA20183017007 | 10.09.2018 Original published format: CA 3017007 | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020051685 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3850888 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 19.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/16, H04B7/185, H04B7/195, H04B7/19 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
H04B7/19 (EP,US);
H04B7/18539 (EP,US);
H04B7/195 (EP,US);
H04W24/02 (US);
H04W28/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/29] | H04W28/16, H04B17/309, H04B7/185, H04W24/02, H04W40/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Validation states | KH | 09.04.2021 | Title | German: | RESSOURCENEINSATZOPTIMIERER FÜR NICHT-GEOSTATIONÄRE UND/ODER GEOSTATIONÄRE KOMMUNIKATIONSSATELLITEN | [2021/29] | English: | RESOURCE DEPLOYMENT OPTIMIZER FOR NON-GEOSTATIONARY AND/OR GEOSTATIONARY COMMUNICATIONS SATELLITES | [2021/29] | French: | OPTIMISEUR DE DÉPLOIEMENT DE RESSOURCES POUR SATELLITES DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATIONS NON GÉOSTATIONNAIRES ET/OU GÉOSTATIONNAIRES | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 29.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004110467 (WANG ARTHUR W [US]); | [A]US2012188880 (BEELER MICHAEL [US], et al); | [XI]US2017181173 (FARAJ ZAKARIYA [FR], et al); | International search | [A]US8914536 (BEELER MICHAEL [US], et al); | [Y]US2017181160 (CORBEL ERWAN [FR], et al); | [XY]US9814004 (TOURET MARC [FR], et al); | [A]US9930621 (DE GAUDENZI RICCARDO [NL]) | by applicant | US2017181173 | US9814004 |