EP3849465 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ATTACHING SOFT TISSUE TO AN IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Onkos Surgical, Inc. 77 East Halsey Road Parsippany, New Jersey 07054 / US | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'AGOSTINO, John 1 Avenue at Port Imperial 1246 West New York, New Jersey 07093 / US | 02 /
HABERMAN, Daniel 77 Park Avenue 1616 Hoboken, New Jersey 07030 / US | 03 /
WODAJO, Felasfa M. 8503 Arlington Boulevard Suite 400 Fairfax, Virginia 22031 / US | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Dr. Langfinger & Partner In der Halde 24 67480 Edenkoben / DE | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 19860991.9 | 19.08.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019US47072 | Priority number, date | US201816131371 | 14.09.2018 Original published format: US201816131371 | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020055548 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3849465 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00, A61F2/30, A61F2/34, A61F2/38 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
A61F2/3859 (EP,US);
A61F2/0811 (EP,US);
A61B17/0401 (US);
A61F2/30 (US);
A61F2/30734 (EP);
A61F2/30749 (EP);
A61F2/30907 (EP);
A61F2/34 (EP);
A61F2/389 (EP);
A61B2017/0414 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0852 (US);
A61F2002/30433 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30461 (EP);
A61F2002/30604 (EP);
A61F2002/30607 (EP);
A61F2002/30736 (EP);
A61F2002/30909 (EP);
A61F2002/30914 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/29] | A61F2/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEFESTIGUNG VON WEICHGEWEBE AN KNOCHEN | [2021/29] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ATTACHING SOFT TISSUE TO AN IMPLANT | [2021/29] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE FIXATION DE TISSU MOU À UN IMPLANT | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 06.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011009973 (MEYERS JOHN E [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0083] * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]US2011130840 (OSKOUEI SHERVIN V [US]) [X] 1,4,6 * paragraph [0037] * * figure 6 *; | [XA]US2016296336 (MAALE GERHARD E [US]) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0048] * * figures 8-13 * [A] 10-15; | [X]US2018214261 (TREACY PATRICK [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] ** figures 2-5 * | International search | [A]US5211661 (SHINJOU KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * entire document *; | [A]US2001011193 (NOGARIN LIVIO [IT]) [A] 1-7 * entire document *; | [Y]US2012035733 (PORTER JOSHUA R [US], et al) [Y] 2, 7 * entire document, especially Figs. 2, 10B; para [0010], [0040], [0045]-[0046] *; | [A]US2014257294 (GÉDET PHILIPPE [CH], et al) [A] 1-7* entire document *; | [A]US2014288657 (LEDERMAN EVAN S [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * entire document *; | [XYA]US2016199071 (COLLAZO CARLOS E [US]) [X] 1, 6 * entire document, especially Figs. 1-2; para [0007], [0019]-[0020], [0029]-[0031], [0041] * [Y] 2, 7 [A] 3-5; | [A]US2016296336 (MAALE GERHARD E [US]) [A] 1-7 * entire document * |