EP3849899 - APPARATUS FOR AERIAL TRANSPORTATION OF PAYLOAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mallikarjunan, Srinath 12 Mansarovar Apts 1 Khader Nawaz Khan Road Chennai 600006 / IN | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 19861071.9 | 03.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019IN50634 | Priority number, date | IN201821034204 | 11.09.2018 Original published format: IN201821034204 | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020053877 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3849899 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 19.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B64C27/10, B64C27/14, B64C27/08, B64C29/00, B64C27/80, B64C27/20 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
B64C27/14 (EP);
B64C27/605 (EP);
B64C27/68 (US);
B64C27/80 (US);
B64C27/82 (EP,US);
B64D27/02 (US);
B64D27/24 (US);
B64U10/20 (EP,US);
B64U30/21 (EP,US);
B64U50/11 (EP,US);
B64U50/30 (EP,US);
B64C2027/8227 (US);
B64U10/16 (US);
B64U10/17 (US);
B64U2101/60 (EP,US);
B64U30/24 (US);
B64U50/13 (EP,US);
B64U50/20 (US);
F16D43/04 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/29] | B64C27/08, B64C29/00, B64C27/80 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR DEN LUFTTRANSPORT VON NUTZLASTEN | [2021/29] | English: | APPARATUS FOR AERIAL TRANSPORTATION OF PAYLOAD | [2021/29] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRANSPORT AÉRIEN D'UNE CHARGE UTILE | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 04.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102005046155 (EMT INGENIEURGESELLSCHAFT DIPL [DE]); | [Y]WO2010134921 (BELL HELICOPTER TEXTRON INC [US], et al); | [A]CN106741903 (TIANJIN SHUGUANG TIANCHENG TECH CO LTD); | [Y]US9902493 (SIMON JEAN MICHEL [FR], et al); | [A]KR101853354B | International search | [Y]WO2010134921 (BELL HELICOPTER TEXTRON INC [US], et al); | [Y]US7942365 (PALCIC PETER XAVIER [US], et al); | [Y]KR101853354B | by applicant | US9902493 |