EP3791538 - SHARED BLOCKCHAIN DATA STORAGE BASED ON ERROR CORRECTION CODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced New Technologies Co., Ltd. Cayman Corporate Centre 27 Hospital Road George Town, Grand Cayman KY1-9008 / KY | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHUO, Haizhen Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F Building 3 No. 969 West Wen Yi Road Yu Hang District, Hangzhou Zhejiang 311121 / CN | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 19861231.9 | 01.08.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019CN98932 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021017009 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3791538 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3791538 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32, G06F21/64, H04L9/00 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
H04L9/3239 (EP);
G06F11/1044 (CN,US);
H04L9/0637 (US);
G06F21/6218 (US);
G06F21/6227 (CN);
G06F21/64 (EP,CN);
G06Q20/3827 (CN);
G06Q20/3829 (CN);
G06Q40/04 (CN);
H04L9/0643 (US);
H04L9/3247 (EP);
H04L9/50 (EP,US);
H04L2209/34 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/11] | H04L9/32, H03M13/05, G06F9/50, G06F11/10, H04L9/08, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEMEINSAM GENUTZTER BLOCKCHAIN-DATENSPEICHER AUF DER GRUNDLAGE EINES FEHLERKORREKTURCODES | [2021/11] | English: | SHARED BLOCKCHAIN DATA STORAGE BASED ON ERROR CORRECTION CODE | [2021/11] | French: | STOCKAGE DE DONNÉES DE CHAÎNE DE BLOCS PARTAGÉ BASÉ SUR UN CODE DE CORRECTION D'ERREUR | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 08.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.04.2023 | AT | 12.04.2023 | CZ | 12.04.2023 | DK | 12.04.2023 | EE | 12.04.2023 | ES | 12.04.2023 | FI | 12.04.2023 | HR | 12.04.2023 | IT | 12.04.2023 | LT | 12.04.2023 | LV | 12.04.2023 | MC | 12.04.2023 | NL | 12.04.2023 | PL | 12.04.2023 | RO | 12.04.2023 | RS | 12.04.2023 | SE | 12.04.2023 | SI | 12.04.2023 | SK | 12.04.2023 | SM | 12.04.2023 | NO | 12.07.2023 | GR | 13.07.2023 | GB | 01.08.2023 | IE | 01.08.2023 | LU | 01.08.2023 | IS | 12.08.2023 | PT | 14.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | FR | 31.08.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
GB | 01.08.2023 | ||
IE | 01.08.2023 | ||
LU | 01.08.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
LU | 01.08.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
LU | 01.08.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
LU | 01.08.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 12.04.2023 | |
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 12.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]CN109359223 (UNIV CHONGQING POSTS & TELECOM) [I] 1-5,8-12 * paragraphs [0009] - [0014] - [0 23] - [0041]; figures 1,2,3,4 * [A] 6,7; | [XI]CN109871366 (UNIV EAST CHINA NORMAL) [X] 1-3,8,10-12 * paragraphs [0005] - [0035] - [0 45] - [0070]; figures 1, 2, 3 * [I] 4-7,9; | [IA] - PERARD DORIANE ET AL, "Erasure Code-Based Low Storage Blockchain Node", 2018 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTERNET OF THINGS (ITHINGS) AND IEEE GREEN COMPUTING AND COMMUNICATIONS (GREENCOM) AND IEEE CYBER, PHYSICAL AND SOCIAL COMPUTING (CPSCOM) AND IEEE SMART DATA (SMARTDATA), IEEE, (20180730), doi:10.1109/CYBERMATICS_2018.2018.00271, pages 1622 - 1627, XP033556426 [I] 1-5,8-12 * Sections III-IV * [A] 6,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/Cybermatics_2018.2018.00271 | International search | [X]US2018323962 (YANAGISAWA HIROKI [JP]) [X] 1-12 * description, paragraphs [0018]-[0044], [0105]-[0116], claims 1-20 and figures 1, 2 and 11 *; | [A]CN108900364 (TAIKANG INSURANCE GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]CN109359223 (UNIV CHONGQING POSTS & TELECOM) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2019158273 (YASUMOTO CHIKAFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document * |