EP3926821 - COMPONENT VOLTAGE LIMITING METHOD AND APPLICATION DEVICE AND SYSTEM THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sungrow Power Supply Co., Ltd. No. 1699 Xiyou Road New & High Technology Industrial Development Zone Hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Renxian No. 1699 Xiyou Road New & High Technology Industrial Development Zone Hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Zongjun No. 1699 Xiyou Road New & High Technology Industrial Development Zone Hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
CAO, Renxian Hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | ||
02 /
YANG, Zongjun Hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | Representative(s) | Zacco Norway AS P.O. Box 488 Skøyen 0213 Oslo / NO | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 19861251.7 | 13.05.2019 | [2021/51] | WO2019CN86555 | Priority number, date | CN201910114213 | 14.02.2019 Original published format: CN201910114213 | [2021/51] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020164199 | Date: | 20.08.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3926821 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02S40/30 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
H02S50/00 (EP);
H02S40/30 (CN);
H02S40/32 (CN,US);
H02J13/0001 (US);
H02J3/00125 (EP);
H02J3/12 (US);
H02S40/34 (CN);
H02J2300/26 (EP);
H02J3/381 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEGRENZUNG DER SPANNUNG EINES MODULS SOWIE VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2021/51] | English: | COMPONENT VOLTAGE LIMITING METHOD AND APPLICATION DEVICE AND SYSTEM THEREOF | [2021/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE LIMITATION DE TENSION DE COMPOSANT ET DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME D'APPLICATION ASSOCIÉS | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2020 | Translation filed | 24.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2020 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 04.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2016118934 (JOHNSON BENJAMIN ALEXANDER [US], et al); | [X]US2017018931 (KAHN SETH M [US], et al) | International search | [X]US2011203635 (BECK BERNHARD [DE]); | [A]CN202111637U (UNIV SOOCHOW); | [A]CN108781055 (SMA SOLAR TECHNOLOGY AG); | [A]CN109067353 (SUNGROW POWER SUPPLY CO LTD) |