EP3775733 - REFRIGERATOR AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do Suwon-si 16677 / KR | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Kye Young 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KANG, Minjeong 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19861703.7 | 10.09.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019KR95033 | Priority number, date | KR20180111257 | 18.09.2018 Original published format: KR 20180111257 | KR20190019986 | 20.02.2019 Original published format: KR 20190019986 | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020060380 | Date: | 26.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3775733 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F25D29/00 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
F25D29/00 (EP,KR);
F25D29/005 (US);
F25D23/028 (US);
G06F3/16 (KR);
G06N20/00 (EP);
G06Q50/12 (KR);
G06T19/006 (KR,US);
H04N23/57 (KR);
F25D2400/361 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | F25D29/00, G06Q50/12, G06K9/00, G06F3/16, G06T19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | KÜHLSCHRANK UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DAVON | [2021/07] | English: | REFRIGERATOR AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING THEREOF | [2021/07] | French: | RÉFRIGÉRATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ASSOCIÉ | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 10.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015161871 (KIM YOUNG HYUN [KR]); | [Y]US2017039511 (CORONA ENRIQUE [US], et al); | [A]US2017219276 (WANG JIN [IE], et al); | [XY]CN107477971 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CN R&D CT, et al); | [Y]US9965798 (VAANANEN MIKKO [FI]); | [A]WO2018128317 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) | International search | [Y]KR20110012510 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US8542906 (PERSSON CARL J [US], et al); | [Y]KR20140059978 (DAEGU GYEONGBUK INST SCIENCE [KR]); | [A]KR20180024654 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | by applicant | CN107477971 |