EP3852856 - ENDOTRACHEAL TUBE STABILIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.10.2021 [2021/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VCB IP Holdings, LLC 6240 Rosebury St Louis, MO 63105 / US | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRONG, James, Ringgold 841 Audubon Drive Clayton, MO 63105 / US | 02 /
DELULIO, David, Mark 307 Woodbluff Drive Lafayette, LA 70503 / US | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 19862991.7 | 19.09.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019US51931 | Priority number, date | US201862733182P | 19.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862733182 P | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020061311 | Date: | 26.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3852856 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/04 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
A61M16/0497 (EP,GB,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STABILISATOR FÜR ENDOTRACHEALTUBUS | [2021/30] | English: | ENDOTRACHEAL TUBE STABILIZER | [2021/30] | French: | STABILISATEUR DE TUBE ENDOTRACHÉAL | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 14.09.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3760811 (ANDREW D) [A] 1-20 * see whole document *; | [A]US2008202529 (FLORY JAMES M [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * see whole document *; | [A]EP2014327 (SCHMITZ SUSANNE [DE]) [A] 1-20 * see whole document and machine translation *; | [Y]US2011220127 (CHANG YA-WEN [TW], et al) [Y] 1-20 * see whole document *; | [Y]US2013068233 (DE LULIO DAVID MARK [US], et al) [Y] 17 * see especially para [0038], fig 9 *; | [A]WO2016116916 (YASSAN DANNY [IL]) [A] 1-20 * see whole document *; | [A]CN205434624U (AFFILIATED HOSPITAL JIANGSU UNIV) [A] 1-20* see whole document and machine translation *; | [A]CN106422028 (THE PEOPLE'S HOSPITAL OF GUANGXI ZHUANG AUTONOMOUS REGION) [A] 1-20 * see whole document and machine translation *; | [XY]US2018099112 (BELENKIY ARKADIY [IL]) [X] 1-16, 18-20 * see especially para [0032], [0033], [0036], [0038], [0044], [0045], [0076], [0082], [0085], [0087], [0089], [0091], [0092], [0095), [0097], [0099], fig 1, 2A-E * [Y] 17 |