EP3846389 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING ROUTE FLAPPING INFORMATION AND RELATED DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/27] | METHOD FOR DETERMINING ROUTING OSCILLATION INFORMATION AND RELATED DEVICE THEREFOR | ||
[2023/28] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GU, Yunan Huawei Administration Building, Bantian,Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHUANG, Shunwan Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
YAN, Gang Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
LI, Zhenbin Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/45] |
Former [2021/27] | Gill Jennings & Every LLP MTH The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 19863087.3 | 17.09.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019CN106068 | Priority number, date | CN20181194966 | 19.09.2018 Original published format: CN201811094966 | [2021/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020057475 | Date: | 26.03.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3846389 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3846389 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L43/065, H04L43/0817, H04L45/02, H04L45/28 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
H04L45/28 (EP,CN);
H04L45/126 (US);
H04L43/065 (EP);
H04L43/0817 (EP,US);
H04L45/123 (US);
H04L45/42 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/43] | H04L12/26, H04L12/751, H04L12/703 | ||
Former IPC [2021/27] | H04L12/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON FLAPPING-ROUTEN-INFORMATIONEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2023/28] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING ROUTE FLAPPING INFORMATION AND RELATED DEVICE THEREFOR | [2023/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'INFORMATION D'UN BATTEMENT DE ROUTAGE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2023/28] |
Former [2021/27] | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON ROUTING-OSCILLATION-INFORMATIONEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | ||
Former [2021/27] | METHOD FOR DETERMINING ROUTING OSCILLATION INFORMATION AND RELATED DEVICE THEREFOR | ||
Former [2021/27] | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'INFORMATIONS D'OSCILLATION DE ROUTAGE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2021 | Translation filed | 01.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 27.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2023 | ES | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | LT | 08.11.2023 | LV | 08.11.2023 | NL | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RS | 08.11.2023 | SE | 08.11.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | NO | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | PT | 08.03.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN101170457 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [Y] 5* paragraphs [0001] - [0020] *; | [XY]US2012327776 (LI WEN-JUI [US], et al) [X] 1,10,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0012] - [0030] - [0031] - [0034] , [0044] * [Y] 5; | [XY]WO2018107882 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,2,6-11,14,15 * abstract * [Y] 5; | EP3547612 [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0003] - [0023] - [0035] - [0047] - [0055] *; | [XY] - GU S ZHUANG Z LI HUAWEI Y, "Network Monitoring Protocol (NMP); draft-gu-network-monitoring-protocol-00.txt", NETWORK MONITORING PROTOCOL (NMP); DRAFT-GU-NETWORK-MONITORING-PROTOCOL-00.TXT; INTERNET-DRAFT: NETWORK WORKING GROUP, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLA, (20180716), pages 1 - 17, XP015127714 [X] 1,3,4,10,12-15 * abstract * * Section 1.1. Motivation; Section 1.2. Overview; pages 3-4 * * Section 4.1. Protocol Selection Options; Section 4.2 Message Types; pages 7-8 * * Section 4.3.5. Statistic Report Message; pages 12-14 * [Y] 5 | [XY] - KAMIZURU Y ET AL, "Distributed Inter-AS route monitor-Distributed Internet Route Eye (DIRE)", PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, 1998. PROCEEDINGS. 1998 INTERNATIONA L CONFERENCE ON TAINAN, TAIWAN 14-16 DEC. 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19981214), doi:10.1109/ICPADS.1998.741129, ISBN 978-0-8186-8603-0, pages 533 - 540, XP010318667 [X] 1,10,14,15 * the whole document * [Y] 5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICPADS.1998.741129 |