EP3853473 - WIND TURBINE HAVING A CIRCULAR AND A CONICAL TOWER STRUCTURE WITH PASSIVE FLOW CONTROL MEANS AND USE OF SUCH A WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/30] | WIND TURBINE HAVING A CIRCULAR OR CONICAL TOWER STRUCTURE WITH PASSIVE FLOW CONTROL MEANS AND USE OF SUCH CIRCULAR TOWER STRUCTURE | ||
[2023/44] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Envision Energy (Denmark) ApS Randersvej 2a 8600 Silkeborg / DK | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRYDENDAL, Ib Løvetvej 9 8740 Brædstrup / DK | 02 /
GRABAU, Peter H.C. Petersens Vej 10 6000 Kolding / DK | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Qip Patentanwälte Dr. Kuehn & Partner mbB Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | Qip Patentanwälte Dr. Kuehn & Partner mbB Goethestraße 8 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19863707.6 | 18.09.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019DK50273 | Priority number, date | DK2018PA70610 | 19.09.2018 Original published format: DK PA201870610 | DK2018PA70814 | 13.12.2018 Original published format: DK PA201870814 | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020057706 | Date: | 26.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3853473 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3853473 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XN | 26.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F03D13/20 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
F03D13/201 (EP);
F03D13/20 (CN);
F03D80/88 (CN);
F15D1/00 (CN);
F05B2240/122 (EP);
F05B2240/912 (EP);
F05B2250/232 (EP);
F05B2260/96 (CN);
Y02E10/72 (EP);
Y02E10/728 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/30] | F03D13/20, E04H12/00, F15D1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WINDTURBINE MIT EINER KREISFÖRMIGEN UND KONISCHEN TURMKONSTRUKTION MIT PASSIVER STRÖMUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERWENDUNG EINER SOLCHEN WINDTURBINE | [2023/44] | English: | WIND TURBINE HAVING A CIRCULAR AND A CONICAL TOWER STRUCTURE WITH PASSIVE FLOW CONTROL MEANS AND USE OF SUCH A WIND TURBINE | [2023/44] | French: | ÉOLIENNE AYANT UNE STRUCTURE DE TOUR CIRCULAIRE ET CONIQUE AVEC DES MOYENS DE COMMANDE DU DÉBIT PASSIFS ET UTILISATION D'UNE TELLE ÉOLIENNE | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/30] | WINDTURBINE MIT EINER KREISFÖRMIGEN ODER KONISCHEN TURMKONSTRUKTION MIT PASSIVER STRÖMUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERWENDUNG EINER SOLCHEN RINGFÖRMIGEN TURMKONSTRUKTION | ||
Former [2021/30] | WIND TURBINE HAVING A CIRCULAR OR CONICAL TOWER STRUCTURE WITH PASSIVE FLOW CONTROL MEANS AND USE OF SUCH CIRCULAR TOWER STRUCTURE | ||
Former [2021/30] | ÉOLIENNE AYANT UNE STRUCTURE DE TOUR CIRCULAIRE OU CONIQUE AVEC DES MOYENS DE COMMANDE DU DÉBIT PASSIFS ET UTILISATION D'UNE TELLE STRUCTURE DE TOUR CIRCULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 26.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.2024 | BG | 07.02.2024 | FI | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | LT | 07.02.2024 | LV | 07.02.2024 | NL | 07.02.2024 | SE | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | PT | 07.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 07.02.2024 | |
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4059129 (FEIS NIKOLAAS); | [I]JPS5483230U ; | [I]US2006054073 (MUEHLNER EDMUND [US]); | [A]WO2018149527 (SIEMENS WIND POWER AS [DK]); | International search | [Y]US4059129 (FEIS NIKOLAAS); | [A]DE19704759 (VERWIEBE CONSTANTIN DIPL ING [DE]); | [Y]DE102004030094 (REIMERS JAN-DIRK [DE]); | [A]EP1287262 (IMP INNOVATIONS LTD [GB]); | [A]WO2018149527 (SIEMENS WIND POWER AS [DK]) | by applicant | US4059129 | JPS5483230U | US2006054073 | WO2018149527 |