EP3860241 - BASE STATION, TERMINAL DEVICE, POSITIONING METHOD AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASEGAWA, Fumihiro c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
TAIRA, Akinori c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
MOCHIZUKI, Mitsuru c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
SHIMODA, Tadahiro c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/31] | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19864742.2 | 25.04.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019JP17791 | Priority number, date | WO2018JP36145 | 27.09.2018 Original published format: PCT/JP2018/036145 | [2021/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020066103 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3860241 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00, H04W16/28, G01S1/08, G01S5/00, G01S5/02, G01S5/12, G01S7/00, G01S13/76 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
G01S5/12 (EP);
H04W64/00 (CN);
G01S5/0236 (EP,US);
G01S1/08 (EP,US);
G01S13/74 (US);
G01S13/762 (EP);
G01S13/765 (EP);
G01S5/0036 (EP,US);
G01S7/003 (EP);
H04W16/28 (CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/31] | H04W64/00, H04W16/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | BASISSTATION, ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG, POSITIONIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2021/31] | English: | BASE STATION, TERMINAL DEVICE, POSITIONING METHOD AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2021/31] | French: | STATION DE BASE, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL, PROCÉDÉ DE POSITIONNEMENT ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2021 | Translation filed | 22.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 25.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/41] | Divisional application(s) | EP24159400.1 / EP4350391 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1014103 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [Y]US2012083278 (KAZMI MUHAMMAD ALI [SE], et al); | [Y]WO2015192113 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [Y]WO2016019354 (INVISITRACK INC [US]); | [XAY]WO2018168670 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]); | [XA]WO2018168630 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]); | International search | [Y]JP2000180186 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC); | [Y]JP2007267346 (RADIANT TECHNOLOGIES INC); | [Y]WO2010113699 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2013510465 ; | [Y]JP2016054518 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M); | [Y]JP2017525195 ; | [Y]JP2017531934 ; | [Y]JP2018033171 (KYOCERA CORP); | [XYA]WO2018168670 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]); | [XYA]WO2018168630 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]); | [PA]US2019028253 (AHN JOONKUI [KR], et al); |