EP3857154 - FLUID FLOW IN THERMAL STORAGE CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nostromo Ltd. Bnei Binyamin 21 P.O. Box 6051 4050000 Even-Yehuda / IL | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEN NUN, Yaron 21 Bnei Binyamin Street 4050000 Even-Yehuda / IL | 02 /
ZIV, Eyal 17 Yohanan Horkanos Street 6249317 Tel-Aviv / IL | 03 /
AMIR, Nadav 40 HaShomrim Street 7622731 Rehovot / IL | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Durán-Corretjer, S.L.P. Còrsega, 329 (Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal) 08037 Barcelona / ES | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 19865303.2 | 25.09.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019IL51059 | Priority number, date | WO2018IB01091 | 25.09.2018 Original published format: PCT/IB2018/001091 | US201962824575P | 27.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962824575 P | US201962824914P | 27.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962824914 P | US201962824541P | 27.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962824541 P | [2021/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020065649 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3857154 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F24F5/00, F28D20/02, F28D20/00 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
F28D20/021 (EP,IL,US);
F24F5/0021 (EP,IL,US);
F28D20/026 (EP,IL,US);
F28F13/12 (EP,IL);
F28D2020/0069 (EP,IL,US);
F28D2020/0082 (EP,IL,US);
Y02E60/14 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/31] | F28D20/00, F24F5/00, F28D20/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSSTRÖMUNG IN THERMISCHEN SPEICHERBEHÄLTERN | [2021/31] | English: | FLUID FLOW IN THERMAL STORAGE CONTAINERS | [2021/31] | French: | ÉCOULEMENT DE FLUIDE DANS DES CONTENANTS DE STOCKAGE THERMIQUE | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 05.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2009105643 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [Y] 4,5* paragraph [0093]; figures 3A-3C *; | [XYI]US2015246484 (HIRSCHBERG SEBASTIAN [CH]) [X] 1-3,6,9-15 * the whole document * [Y] 4,5 [I] 7,8 | International search | [XY]US4205656 (SCARLATA ROBERT W [US]) [X] 1, 2, 6, 7, 10, 11 * whole whole * [Y] 3-5, 8, 9, 12-28; | [Y]JPS61265493 (FUJIKURA LTD) [Y] 24-28 * abstract, fig. I *; | [A]JPS63273787 (KUBOTA LTD) [A] 1-28 * whole *; | [XY]US5090207 (GILBERTSON THOMAS A [CA], et al) [X] 1, 2, 6, 7, 10, 11 * whole whole * [Y] 3-5, 8, 9, 12-28; | [A]JP2016029333 (ISENTROPIC LTD) [A] 1-28* abstract, figs. 1-4 *; | [A]US2016195320 (KONOVALOV ALEXANDER ALEKSEEVICH [RU]) [A] 1-28 * whole * | by applicant | US2015246484 |