EP3797985 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING BONDED BODY OF DIFFERENT MATERIALS AND BONDED STRUCTURE OF DIFFERENT MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Jin Mi LG CHEM Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
MIN, In Ki LG CHEM Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
JEONG, Yu Jin LG CHEM Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 19865390.9 | 18.09.2019 | [2021/13] | WO2019KR12048 | Priority number, date | KR20180115903 | 28.09.2018 Original published format: KR 20180115903 | [2021/13] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020067672 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3797985 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B32B3/30, B32B15/08, B32B27/08, B23K26/364, B29C65/44, B32B7/023, B32B15/085, B32B15/088, B32B15/09, B32B15/18, B32B15/20, B32B27/20, B32B27/32, B32B27/34, B32B27/36 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
B29C65/1635 (EP,US);
B32B3/30 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/364 (EP);
B29C65/1616 (EP);
B29C65/1654 (EP);
B29C65/1674 (EP);
B29C65/8215 (EP);
B29C65/8253 (EP);
B29C66/0246 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/30321 (EP);
B29C66/30325 (EP);
B29C66/43 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B29C66/7212 (EP);
B29C66/7392 (EP);
B29C66/742 (EP);
B32B15/08 (EP,KR);
B32B15/085 (EP,US);
B32B15/088 (EP);
B32B15/09 (EP);
B32B15/18 (EP,US);
B32B15/20 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP,KR);
B32B27/16 (US);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/34 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/365 (EP);
B32B37/16 (US);
B32B38/0008 (US);
B32B38/10 (US);
B32B7/023 (EP);
B29C65/44 (EP);
B32B2250/03 (EP);
B32B2262/101 (EP,US);
B32B2262/106 (EP);
B32B2264/102 (EP);
B32B2270/00 (US);
B32B2307/40 (KR);
B32B2307/414 (US);
B32B2307/416 (EP);
B32B2307/54 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP,KR);
B32B2309/105 (US);
B32B2310/0843 (US);
B32B2311/30 (US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (EP);
B29C66/7212, B29K2309/08 (EP) |
Former IPC [2021/13] | B32B3/30, B32B15/08, B32B27/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GEBUNDENEN KÖRPERS AUS UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN MATERIALIEN UND GEBUNDENE STRUKTUR AUS VERSCHIEDENEN MATERIALIEN | [2021/13] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING BONDED BODY OF DIFFERENT MATERIALS AND BONDED STRUCTURE OF DIFFERENT MATERIALS | [2021/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE FABRIQUER UN CORPS LIÉ DE DIFFÉRENTS MATÉRIAUX ET STRUCTURE LIÉE DE DIFFÉRENTS MATÉRIAUX | [2021/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2020 | Translation filed | 21.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 03.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2005042456 (KRAUSE FRANK [DE], et al); | [A]JP2012232531 (DAICEL CORP); | [YA]JP2016141092 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [A]KR20180036574 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) | International search | [Y]JP2005041073 (TOYODA MACHINE WORKS LTD) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0009]-[0017]. *; | [A]JP2005088355 (TOYODA MACHINE WORKS LTD) [A] 1-10 * See the entire document. *; | [Y]JP2014046599 (NIPPON LIGHT METAL CO) [Y] 3 * See paragraph [0018] and claim 1. *; | [A]JP2014065288 (DAICEL POLYMER LTD, et al) [A] 1-10* See the entire document. *; | [Y]KR20180036574 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0011], [0025], [0073]-[0074] and claims 1-13. * | by applicant | KR101499665B |