EP3857852 - CONTENT SERVER FOR PROVIDING APPLICATION UNIFICATION FOR PUBLIC NETWORK APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robinson, Andrew 16715 Oak View Cir Morgan Hill, California 95037 / US | For all designated states Tumarkin, Alexei 11540 Hillpark Ln. Los Altos, California 94024 / US | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Ahmad, Sheikh Shakeel, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 19865420.4 | 24.09.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019US52791 | Priority number, date | US201862735617P | 24.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862735617 P | [2021/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020068874 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3857852 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/08 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
H04L67/02 (EP);
H04L67/565 (EP);
H04L67/567 (EP);
H04L61/4511 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/31] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INHALTSSERVER ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON ANWENDUNGSVEREINHEITLICHUNG FÜR ÖFFENTLICHE NETZWERKANWENDUNGEN | [2021/31] | English: | CONTENT SERVER FOR PROVIDING APPLICATION UNIFICATION FOR PUBLIC NETWORK APPLICATIONS | [2021/31] | French: | SERVEUR DE CONTENU PERMETTANT DE FOURNIR UNE UNIFICATION D'APPLICATIONS POUR DES APPLICATIONS DE RÉSEAU PUBLIC | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 04.11.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2015215381 (LOWELL GEORGE MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1,3-5,7-9,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] - [0026] - [0038] * [I] 2,6,10; | [I]US2018189824 (YANAMADALA SURESH [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * abstract ** paragraphs [0017] - [0050] * | International search | [XY]US9565166 (HOLLOWAY LEE HAHN [US], et al) [X] 1, 3-12, 14-16 * ; Entire document, especially, Abstract; col 3, In 41-42; col 4, In 12-16; col 4, In 35-50; col 5, In 48-53; col 5, In 57-59; col 7, In 51-53; col 12, In 7-9; col 16, In 32-39; col 18, In 15-25; col 39, In 66 - col 40, In 21; col 46, In 26-29; col 46, In 61-64; col 49, In 50-53 * [Y] 2, 13; | [Y]US2018205705 (KUPFERSCHMIED RON [IL], et al) [Y] 2, 13* ; para [0001], [0047], [0051], [0076] * |