EP3856895 - BIHAPTENIZED AUTOLOGOUS VACCINES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BioVaxys Inc. 1177 Avenue of the Americas, 5th Floor New York, NY 10036 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/31] | For all designated states BioVaxys Inc. 1177 Avenue of the Americas 5th Floor New York NY 10036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERD, David 125 Heacock Lane Wyncote, PA 19095 / US | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 19865684.5 | 24.09.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019US52644 | Priority number, date | US201862735381P | 24.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862735381 P | US201862746066P | 16.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862746066 P | [2021/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020068786 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3856895 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/09, C07K14/705, A61K35/13, A61K39/00 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
C07K14/70575 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/13 (EP,KR);
A61K39/39541 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/0011 (EP,KR);
A61P35/04 (EP,KR);
C07K14/705 (EP,KR);
C07K16/2818 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/5152 (EP,KR);
A61K2039/545 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55594 (EP);
A61K2039/6012 (EP);
A61K2039/70 (EP);
A61K2300/00 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K35/13, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/0011, A61K2300/00 (KR,EP);
A61K39/39541, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/31] | C12N5/09, C07K14/705, A61K35/13 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | BIHAPTENISIERTE AUTOLOGE IMPFSTOFFE UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN | [2021/31] | English: | BIHAPTENIZED AUTOLOGOUS VACCINES AND USES THEREOF | [2021/31] | French: | VACCINS AUTOLOGUES BIHAPTÉNISÉS ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 28.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0038710 (UNIV JEFFERSON [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 26, line 1 * * claims 1,9,12,18,30,31 *; | [Y]US2015202291 (BOSCH MARNIX LEO [US], et al) [Y] 1-15* claims 1,9,20 *; | [Y] - KLEPONIS JENNIFER ET AL, "Fueling the engine and releasing the break: combinational therapy of cancer vaccines and immune checkpoint inhibitors", CANCER BIOLOGY & MEDICINE, TIANJIN YIKE DAXUE FUSHU ZHONGLIU YIYUAN,TIANJIN MEDICAL UNIVERSITY CANCER INSTITUTE AND HOSPITAL, CN, (20150901), vol. 12, no. 3, doi:10.7497/J.ISSN.2095-3941.2015.0046, ISSN 2095-3941, pages 201 - 208, XP008182450 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2 - page 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7497/j.issn.2095-3941.2015.0046 | [Y] - BERD D ED - GIERSING BIRGITTE K ET AL, "Autologous, hapten-modified vaccine as a treatment for human cancers", VACCINE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010321), vol. 19, no. 17-19, doi:10.1016/S0264-410X(00)00490-4, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 2565 - 2570, XP004231081 [Y] 1-15 * page 3, column 2 - page 4, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(00)00490-4 | [Y] - A. RIBAS ET AL, "Dendritic Cell Vaccination Combined with CTLA4 Blockade in Patients with Metastatic Melanoma", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20091001), vol. 15, no. 19, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-09-1254, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 6267 - 6276, XP055329094 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 8 - page 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-09-1254 | International search | [Y]WO9640173 (UNIV JEFFERSON [US], et al) [Y] 17-21 * ; page 59, lines 21-23; page 61, line 20 *; | [Y]WO9956773 (UNIV JEFFERSON [US], et al) [Y] 4/1-3, 5/1-3, 7-8 * ; page 16, line 26; page 31, lines 6-9; page 32, line 11 *; | [Y]WO0038710 (UNIV JEFFERSON [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 4/1-3, 5/1-3, 7-21 * ; page 21, lines 4-8; page 25, line 28 - page 26, line 12 *; | [Y]WO2005080990 (ISTITUTO NAZ DELLE MALATTIE IN [IT], et al) [Y] 16 * ; page 5, paragraph 3; page 9, paragraph 4; page 26, paragraph 4; claim 25 *; | [Y]US2013034580 (KHANDKE LAKSHMI [US], et al) [Y] 16 * ; paragraphs [0123], [0141] *; | [Y]WO2015069770 (COGNATE BIOSERVICES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 4/1-3, 5/1-3, 7-15 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0011], [0083], [0089]; claims 6, 9-10 *; | [Y]WO2015181220 (QIAGEN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 21* ; claims 1, 6 *; | [Y] - KAKOSCHKY, B et al., "Selective Targeting of Tumor Associated Macrophages in Different Tumor Models", PLoS One, (20180215), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 1 - 13, XP055701870 [Y] 17-21 * ; page 4/13, paragraph 3; DOI: 10.1371/journal.pone.0193015 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0193015 |