EP3859058 - COPOLYMERIZED POLYPHENYLENE SULFIDE FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/31] | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8666 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUCHIYA, Shohei c/o Mishima Plant, Toray Industries, Inc., 4845 Mishima-shi, Shizuoka 411-8652 / JP | 02 /
KATSUTA, Hiroo c/o Shiga Plant, Toray Industries, Inc., 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 03 /
FUNATSU, Yoshitsugu c/o Mishima Plant, Toray Industries, Inc., 4845, Mishima-shi Shizuoka 411-8652 / JP | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 19867250.3 | 19.09.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019JP36674 | Priority number, date | JP20180182527 | 27.09.2018 Original published format: JP 2018182527 | [2021/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020066815 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3859058 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/76 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
D01F6/765 (EP,US);
D01F6/76 (KR);
C08G75/0209 (US);
D01F6/78 (EP);
D04H1/542 (EP);
D04H1/551 (EP,US);
D04H1/558 (EP);
D04H1/732 (EP,US);
D21H13/20 (EP);
D10B2331/301 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | COPOLYMERISIERTE POLYPHENYLENSULFIDFASERN | [2021/31] | English: | COPOLYMERIZED POLYPHENYLENE SULFIDE FIBERS | [2021/31] | French: | FIBRE DE SULFURE DE POLYPHÉNYLÈNE COPOLYMÉRISÉ | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2021 | Translation filed | 05.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 05.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 29.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2009068149 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]EP2065500 (ASAHI KASEI FIBERS CORP [JP]); | [A]EP2511409 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) | International search | [A]JPS5083500 ; | [A]JPS6114228 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD); | [A]JPS61152828 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH01126334 (TOTO KASEI KK); | [A]JPH02269126 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO); | [A]JPH07196799 (TONEN SEKIYUKAGAKU KK) | by applicant | JPH07189169 | JP2007039840 | JP2010077544 |