EP3852065 - DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XUE, Changliang Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Jianfei Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
FU, Yuxin Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/29] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19867868.2 | 27.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019CN108581 | Priority number, date | CN201811156022 | 30.09.2018 Original published format: CN201811156022 | [2021/29] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020063878 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3852065 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/73, G06T7/246 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
G06T7/73 (EP);
G06T7/75 (US);
G06T17/00 (US);
G06T7/246 (EP);
G06T2200/04 (EP);
G06T2207/10016 (EP);
G06T2207/10028 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/29] | G06T7/70, G06T7/246 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | DATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2021/29] | English: | DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2021/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2021 | Translation filed | 15.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 27.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - Geneva Patrick ET AL, "LIPS: LiDAR-Inertial 3D Plane SLAM", (20180907), pages 1 - 9, URL: https://www.researchgate.net/profile/Yulin-Yang-4/publication/327514859_LIPS_LiDAR-Inertial_3D_Plane_SLAM/links/5b92ebdd299bf1473923ca77/LIPS-LiDAR-Inertial-3D-Plane-SLAM.pdf, (20210921), XP055842989 [X] 1-7,9-15 * abstract * * Sections III, V * * Section VI.D * [Y] 8 | [XY] - Geneva Patrick ET AL, "LIPS: LiDAR-Inertial 3D Plane SLAM", (20180907), pages 1 - 25, URL: https://www.researchgate.net/profile/Yulin-Yang-4/publication/327514969_RPNG_Tech_Report_for_LIPS_2018/data/5b92f08ca6fdccfd5423bbfe/rpng-tr-2018-lips.pdf, (20210920), XP055842215 [X] 1-15 * Sections 1, 2, 3, 4, 7 * [Y] 8 | [L] - Geneva Patrick ET AL, "RPNG Tech Report for LIPS 2018", (20180907), URL: https://www.researchgate.net/publication/327514969_RPNG_Tech_Report_for_LIPS_2018, (20210920), XP055842772 [L] 1-15 * the whole document * |