EP3861387 - RENDERING LOCATION SPECIFIC VIRTUAL CONTENT IN ANY LOCATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magic Leap, Inc. 7500 West Sunrise Boulevard Plantation, FL 33322 / US | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRODSKY, Jonathan 150 NE 15th Avenue Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301 / US | 02 /
BUSTO, Javier Antonio 1700 SW 78th Avenue, Apt. 513 Plantation, FL 33324 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Martin Wilkins 390 City View Drive Fort Lauderdale, FL 33311 / US | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Lecomte & Partners 76-78, rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | [2021/32] | Application number, filing date | 19868676.8 | 04.10.2019 | [2021/32] | WO2019US54836 | Priority number, date | US201862742061P | 05.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862742061 P | [2021/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020072985 | Date: | 09.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3861387 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G02B6/26, G02B6/34, G02F1/01, G06T7/20, G02B27/01, G06F1/16, G06F3/0346, G06F3/04815, G06K9/62, G06T19/00, G06V20/20, G06V10/82 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G02B27/017 (EP,US);
G06F1/163 (EP);
G06F3/012 (EP);
G06F3/013 (EP);
G06F3/016 (EP);
G06F3/017 (EP);
G06F3/0346 (EP);
G06F3/04815 (EP,US);
G06T19/003 (US);
G06T19/006 (EP,US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06V20/20 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0138 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/32] | G02B6/26, G02B6/34, G02F1/01, G06T7/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Title | German: | DARSTELLUNG EINES ORTSSPEZIFISCHEN VIRTUELLEN INHALTS AN EINEM BELIEBIGEN ORT | [2021/32] | English: | RENDERING LOCATION SPECIFIC VIRTUAL CONTENT IN ANY LOCATION | [2021/32] | French: | RENDU D'UN CONTENU VIRTUEL SPÉCIFIQUE À UN EMPLACEMENT DANS N'IMPORTE QUEL EMPLACEMENT | [2021/32] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 23.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007298866 (GAUDIANO PAOLO [US], et al); | [XYI]US2012249741 (MACIOCCI GIULIANO [GB], et al); | [Y]US2014372957 (KEANE BRIAN E [US], et al); | [Y]US2015321103 (BARNETT STUART [GB], et al); | [Y]WO2015192117 (MAGIC LEAP INC [US]); | [Y]US2017094227 (WILLIAMS KJERSTIN IRJA [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US2007298866 (GAUDIANO PAOLO [US], et al); | [XY]US2012249741 (MACIOCCI GIULIANO [GB], et al); | [A]US2014003762 (MACNAMARA JOHN GRAHAM [US]); | [Y]US2014372957 (KEANE BRIAN E [US], et al); | [A]US2015178939 (BRADSKI GARY R [US], et al); | [Y]US2015321103 (BARNETT STUART [GB], et al); | [Y]WO2015192117 (MAGIC LEAP INC [US]); | [A]US2016180593 (YANG YAN [CN]); | [A]US2016196692 (KJALLSTROM JAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2017094227 (WILLIAMS KJERSTIN IRJA [US], et al); | by applicant | US2012249741 | US2014003762 | US2015016777 | US2015178939 | US2018045963 | US2018268611 |