EP3865609 - NANOFIBER PRODUCTION APPARATUS AND NANOFIBER PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M-Techx Inc. 25-9, Shinkawa 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0033 / JP | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEGAYA Morihiko c/o M-TEchX Inc., 8-10, Ueno 3-Chome, Iwatsuki-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 339-0073 / JP | 02 /
SOTA Hiroyoshi c/o M-TEchX Inc., 8-10, Ueno 3-Chome, Iwatsuki-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 339-0073 / JP | 03 /
TAKIGAWA Yasuhiro c/o M-TEchX Inc., 8-10, Ueno 3-Chome, Iwatsuki-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 339-0073 / JP | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2021/33] | Application number, filing date | 19870112.0 | 09.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019JP39888 | Priority number, date | JP20180191146 | 09.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018191146 | [2021/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020075774 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3865609 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | D01D5/04, D04H3/016 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
D01D5/14 (EP,US);
D01D5/04 (EP,KR,US);
D01D5/0985 (US);
B82Y30/00 (US);
B82Y40/00 (US);
D01D5/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR NANOFASERHERSTELLUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR NANOFASERHERSTELLUNG | [2021/33] | English: | NANOFIBER PRODUCTION APPARATUS AND NANOFIBER PRODUCTION METHOD | [2021/33] | French: | APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION DE NANOFIBRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE NANOFIBRE | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2021 | Translation filed | 29.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 03.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/40] | 26.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS57112451 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]WO2010055693 (FUENCE CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2012122176 (TAKAHASHI MITSUHIRO); | [Y]JP2012202010 (KURITA WATER IND LTD, et al); | [A]CN102965743 (UNIV XIAMEN); | [Y]WO2015145880 (TAKAHASHI MITSUHIRO [JP]) | by applicant | JP2012127008 | JP2015145880 | JP2016023399 | JP2016183435 |