EP3863677 - POLY(Beta-AMINO ESTER) NANOPARTICLES FOR THE NON-VIRAL DELIVERY OF PLASMID DNA FOR GENE EDITING AND RETINAL GENE THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Johns Hopkins University 3400 North Charles Street Baltimore, Maryland 21218 / US | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREEN, Jordan J. c/o The Johns Hopkins University 3400 North Charles Street Baltimore, Maryland 21218 / US | 02 /
WILSON, David c/o The Johns Hopkins University 3400 North Charles Street Baltimore, Maryland 21218 / US | 03 /
RUI, Yuan c/o The Johns Hopkins University 3400 North Charles Street Baltimore, Maryland 21218 / US | 04 /
ZACK, Donald J. c/o The Johns Hopkins University 3400 North Charles Street Baltimore, Maryland 21218 / US | 05 /
MISHRA, Bibhudatta c/o The Johns Hopkins University 3400 North Charles Street Baltimore, Maryland 21218 / US | 06 /
SRIPATHI, Srinivasa Rao c/o The Johns Hopkins University 3400 North Charles Street Baltimore, Maryland 21218 / US | 07 /
BERLINICKE, Cynthia A. c/o The Johns Hopkins University 3400 North Charles Street Baltimore, Maryland 21218 / US | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/33] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 19870203.7 | 10.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019US55741 | Priority number, date | US201862743883P | 10.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862743883 P | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020077159 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3863677 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/34, A61K9/51, A61K47/14, A61K48/00, C08G69/26 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
C12N15/88 (EP,US);
C08G69/26 (EP,US);
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N15/85 (EP);
C12N15/907 (EP);
A61K48/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Title | German: | POLY(BETA-AMINO-ESTER)-NANOPARTIKEL ZUR NICHT-VIRALEN ABGABE VON PLASMID-DNA FÜR DIE GENBEARBEITUNG UND DIE RETINALE GENTHERAPIE | [2021/33] | English: | POLY(Beta-AMINO ESTER) NANOPARTICLES FOR THE NON-VIRAL DELIVERY OF PLASMID DNA FOR GENE EDITING AND RETINAL GENE THERAPY | [2021/33] | French: | NANOPARTICULES DE POLY (Beta-AMINO ESTER) POUR L'ADMINISTRATION NON VIRALE D'ADN DE PLASMIDE POUR L'ÉDITION GÉNIQUE ET LA THÉRAPIE GÉNIQUE DE RÉTINE | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 18.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 27.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 27.09.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 27.09.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.10.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - SUNSHINE J C ET AL, "Poly(beta-Amino Ester)-Nanoparticle Mediated Transfection of Retinal Pigment Epithelial Cells In Vitro and In Vivo", PLOS ONE, PUBLIC LIBRARY OF SCIENCE, US, vol. 7, no. 5, doi:10.1371/JOURNAL.PONE.0037543, ISSN 1932-6203, (20120521), pages E37543 - 1, (20120521), XP002746169 [X] 1,2,5,7-15 * Title; Abstract; Fig. 1; Fig. 10 * [I] 1-5,7-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0037543 | [XDI] - DEZHONG ZHOU ET AL, "Poly(beta-Amino Ester)-Nanoparticle Mediated Transfection of Retinal Pigment Epithelial Cells In Vitro and In Vivo", SCIENCE ADVANCES, (20160601), vol. 2, no. 6, doi:10.1126/sciadv.1600102, page e1600102, XP055539263 [XD] 1,5,6,8-10,15 * Title; Abstract; Fig. 1, Fig. 2 * [I] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/sciadv.1600102 | [XDI] - ZHU DA ET AL, "Nanoparticles Based on Poly ([beta]-Amino Ester) and HPV16-Targeting CRISPR/shRNA as Potential Drugs for HPV16-Related Cervical Malignancy", MOLECULAR THERAPY, US, vol. 26, no. 10, doi:10.1016/j.ymthe.2018.07.019, ISSN 1525-0016, (20181001), pages 2443 - 2455, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC6171328/pdf/main.pdf, XP055907040 [XD] 1-3,5,8-12,15 * Title; Abstract * [I] 1-5,7-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymthe.2018.07.019 | [XI] - James Cliff Kaczmarek, "Development of Polymer -Lipid Nanoparticles for Potent mRNA Delivery to the Lung", (20180930), URL: https://dspace.mit.edu/bitstream/handle/1721.1/121895/1103314257-MIT.pdf?sequence=1&isAllowed=y, (20200402), XP055682159 [X] 1-3,5,8-12 * Title; p. 82; Chapters 3, 4, 5, 6; p. 95; p. 172 * [I] 1-5,7-15 | [XP] - RUI YUAN ET AL, "Reducible Branched Ester-Amine Quadpolymers (rBEAQs) Codelivering Plasmid DNA and RNA Oligonucleotides Enable CRISPR/Cas9 Genome Editing", APPLIED MATERIALS & INTERFACES, US, (20190222), vol. 11, no. 11, doi:10.1021/acsami.8b20206, ISSN 1944-8244, pages 10472 - 10480, XP055925498 [XP] 1-5,7-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acsami.8b20206 | [XP] - WILSON DAVID R. ET AL, "Differentially Branched Ester Amine Quadpolymers with Amphiphilic and pH-Sensitive Properties for Efficient Plasmid DNA Delivery", MOLECULAR PHARMACEUTICS, US, vol. 16, no. 2, doi:10.1021/acs.molpharmaceut.8b00963, ISSN 1543-8384, (20190204), pages 655 - 668, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC7297465/pdf/nihms-1581884.pdf, XP055840765 [XP] 1-5,7-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.molpharmaceut.8b00963 | [XI] - KOZIELSKI KRISTEN L. ET AL, "Bioreducible Cationic Polymer-Based Nanoparticles for Efficient and Environmentally Triggered Cytoplasmic siRNA Delivery to Primary Human Brain Cancer Cells", ACS NANO, US, (20140327), vol. 8, no. 4, doi:10.1021/nn500704t, ISSN 1936-0851, pages 3232 - 3241, XP055958014 [X] 1,5,8-10,15 * Title; Abstract; Scheme 1 * [I] 1-5,7-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nn500704t | [XI] - KRISTEN L. KOZIELSKI ET AL, "A bioreducible linear poly(β-amino ester) for siRNA delivery", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, UK, (20130101), vol. 49, no. 46, doi:10.1039/c3cc40718g, ISSN 1359-7345, page 5319, XP055341016 [X] 1,5,8-10,15 * Title; Abstract; Scheme 1 * [I] 1-5,7-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3cc40718g | [XI] - CUTLAR LARA ET AL, "Highly Branched Poly([beta]-Amino Esters): Synthesis and Application in Gene Delivery", BIOMACROMOLECULES, US, vol. 16, no. 9, doi:10.1021/acs.biomac.5b00966, ISSN 1525-7797, (20150825), pages 2609 - 2617, URL: https://pubs.acs.org/doi/pdf/10.1021/acs.biomac.5b00966, XP055921486 [X] 1,5,6,8-10,15 * Title; Abstract; Fig .1 * [I] 1-6,8-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.biomac.5b00966 | [XI] - LIU SHUAI ET AL, "Biodegradable Highly Branched Poly([beta]-Amino Ester)s for Targeted Cancer Cell Gene Transfection", ACS BIOMATERIALS SCIENCE & ENGINEERING, (20161026), vol. 3, no. 7, doi:10.1021/acsbiomaterials.6b00503, ISSN 2373-9878, pages 1283 - 1286, XP055925529 [X] 1,5,6,8-10,15 * Title; Abstract; Fig. 1 * [I] 1-6,8-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acsbiomaterials.6b00503 | [XI] - YONGSHENG GAO ET AL, "Highly Branched Poly(?-amino esters) for Non-Viral Gene Delivery: High Transfection Efficiency and Low Toxicity Achieved by Increasing Molecular Weight", BIOMACROMOLECULES, US, (20161003), vol. 17, no. 11, doi:10.1021/acs.biomac.6b01120, ISSN 1525-7797, pages 3640 - 3647, XP055539247 [X] 1,5,6,8-10,15 * Title; Abstract; Scheme 1 * [I] 1-6,8-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.biomac.6b01120 | [XI] - ZHOU DEZHONG ET AL, "Highly branched poly([beta]-amino ester)s for skin gene therapy", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20160608), vol. 244, doi:10.1016/J.JCONREL.2016.06.014, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 336 - 346, XP029850289 [X] 1,5,6,8-10,15 * Title; Abstract; Fig. 2 * [I] 1-6,8-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2016.06.014 | [XI] - SHUAI LIU ET AL, "Alkylated branched poly(beta-amino esters) demonstrate strong DNA encapsulation, high nanoparticle stability and robust gene transfection efficacy", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY. B, GB, (20170101), vol. 5, no. 27, doi:10.1039/C7TB00996H, ISSN 2050-750X, pages 5307 - 5310, XP055539258 [X] 1,5,6,8-10,15 * Title; Abstract; Fig .1 * [I] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C7TB00996H | [ ] - LIU SHUAI ET AL, "Supplementary information.- Alkylated branched poly([beta]-amino esters) demonstrate strong DNA encapsulation, high nanoparticle stability and robust gene transfection efficacy", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY. B, GB, (20170101), vol. 5, no. 27, doi:10.1039/C7TB00996H, ISSN 2050-750X, pages 5307 - 5310, XP055971350 [ ] * Supporting information sections 2.2, 2.5, Fig. S7; p. 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C7TB00996H | [XI] - JIAN-YUAN HUANG ET AL, "Tailoring highly branched poly(β-amino ester)s: a synthetic platform for epidermal gene therapy", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, (20150414), vol. 51, no. 40, doi:10.1039/C5CC02193F, ISSN 1359-7345, pages 8473 - 8476, XP055211464 [X] 1,5,6,8-10,15 * Title; abstract; figure 1; supplementary information section 2.2 * [I] 1-6,8-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C5CC02193F | [ ] - HUANG JIAN-YUAN ET AL, "Supplementary information.- Tailoring highly branched poly([beta]-amino ester)s: a synthetic platform for epidermal gene therapy", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, UK, (20150101), vol. 51, no. 40, doi:10.1039/C5CC02193F, ISSN 1359-7345, pages 8473 - 8476, XP055971365 [ ] * Supplementary information section 2.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C5CC02193F | International search | [A]US2014199306 (GHOSH JOY [US], et al) [A] 1-8, 14-16, 21-44 * entire document *; | [A]US2017216363 (QUINONES-HINOJOSA ALFREDO [US], et al) [A] 1-8, 14-16, 21-44 * entire document *; | [A]WO2018002719 (CRISPR THERAPEUTICS AG [CH]) [A] 1-8, 14-16, 21-44 * entire document *; | [PA]WO2019075056 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]) [PA] 1-8, 14-16, 21-44* entire document * |