EP3863607 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR ENHANCING SYSTEMIC DELIVERABILITY, TOLERABILITY, AND EFFICACY OF CATIONIC MACROCYCLIC PEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Southern California 1150 S. Olive Street, Suite 2300 Los Angeles, CA 90015 / US | [2023/17] |
Former [2021/33] | For all designated states Tran, Dat 2912 West Hellman Ave. Alhambra CA 918032 / US | ||
For all designated states Schaal, Justin B. 215 S. Orange Street Orange CA 92866 / US | |||
For all designated states Tran, Patti 2912 W. Hellman Ave. Alhambra CA 91803 / US | |||
For all designated states Selsted, Michael E. 810 N. Chester Ave. Pasadena CA 91104 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAN, Dat Alhambra CA 91803 / US | 02 /
SCHAAL, Justin B. Orange CA 92866 / US | 03 /
TRAN, Patti Alhambra CA 91803 / US | 04 /
SELSTED, Michael E. Pasadena CA 91104 / US | [2023/17] |
Former [2021/33] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Hutter, Anton Venner Shipley LLP 5 Stirling House Stirling Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford GU2 7RF / GB | [2021/33] | Application number, filing date | 19870455.3 | 09.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019US55362 | Priority number, date | US201862743243P | 09.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862743243 P | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020076925 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3863607 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/08, A61K47/10, A61K47/14, A61K38/17, A61P29/00, A61P19/02, A61P1/00, A61L2/00 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
A61K9/0019 (EP);
A61K9/08 (EP,CN,KR);
A61K38/12 (CN,US);
A61K38/1709 (EP);
A61K38/1729 (CN,KR);
A61K47/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K47/12 (CN);
A61K47/14 (KR);
A61L2/0017 (CN,KR);
A61P1/00 (EP,CN,KR);
A61P19/02 (EP,CN,KR);
A61P29/00 (EP,CN,KR);
A61P3/10 (CN);
A61P35/00 (CN);
C07K14/4723 (EP);
A61L2202/21 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEIGERUNG DER SYSTEMISCHEN ABGABEFÄHIGKEIT, VERTRÄGLICHKEIT UND WIRKSAMKEIT VON KATIONISCHEN MAKROCYCLISCHEN PEPTIDEN | [2021/33] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR ENHANCING SYSTEMIC DELIVERABILITY, TOLERABILITY, AND EFFICACY OF CATIONIC MACROCYCLIC PEPTIDES | [2021/33] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR AMÉLIORER LA CAPACITÉ D'ADMINISTRATION SYSTÉMIQUE, LA TOLÉRABILITÉ ET L'EFFICACITÉ DE PEPTIDES MACROCYCLIQUES CATIONIQUES | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 31.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 06.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2005049061 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [Y] 1-12* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2013007596 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 15, line 14 - line 20 * * page 16, line 8 - line 11 * | International search | [X]US2004086535 (MAURY WENDY [US], et al) [X] 9-11, 13-15, 21-23 , 29-31 * abstract; partagraphs [0132]-[0133], [0138]; claims 1, 41 *; | [A]US2006287221 (KNUDSEN LISELOTTE B [DK], et al) [A] 9-11, 13-15, 21-23 , 29-31 * abstract; claims 56-58 *; | [X]US2013157964 (SELSTED MICHAEL E [US], et al) [X] 9-11, 13-15, 21-23 , 29-31 * abstract; paragraphs [0010], [0078], [0080]-[0081], [0089]-[0090]; claims 1, 15 *; | [A]WO2016059593 (PIRAMAL ENTPR LTD [IN]) [A] 9-11, 13-15, 21-23 , 29-31* the whole document *; | [A]US2017035845 (SELSTED MICHAEL E [US], et al) [A] 9-11, 13-15, 21-23 , 29-31 * abstract; paragraphs [0005], [0071]; claims 1-17 * |