EP3865706 - VERTICAL SHAFT WIND POWER GENERATION DEVICE AND HYDROPOWER GENERATION DEVICE ACCOMMODATED IN CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTN Corporation 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0003 / JP | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARASAWA, Ryosuke c/o NTN CORPORATION 105, Hidamarinooka 5-chome Kuwana-shi, Mie 511-0867 / JP | 02 /
OKUNO, Tomohisa c/o NTN CORPORATION 105, Hidamarinooka 5-chome Kuwana-shi, Mie 511-0867 / JP | 03 /
AKAGAWA, Mitsuru c/o NTN CORPORATION 105, Hidamarinooka 5-chome Kuwana-shi, Mie 511-0867 / JP | 04 /
NISHIMURA, Kaname c/o NTN CORPORATION 105, Hidamarinooka 5-chome Kuwana-shi, Mie 511-0867 / JP | [2023/50] |
Former [2021/33] | 01 /
KARASAWA, Ryosuke c/o NTN CORPORATION, 105, Hidamarinooka 5-chome Kuwana-shi, Mie 511-0867 / JP | ||
02 /
OKUNO, Tomohisa c/o NTN CORPORATION, 105, Hidamarinooka 5-chome Kuwana-shi, Mie 511-0867 / JP | |||
03 /
AKAGAWA, Mitsuru c/o NTN CORPORATION, 105, Hidamarinooka 5-chome Kuwana-shi, Mie 511-0867 / JP | |||
04 /
NISHIMURA, Kaname c/o NTN CORPORATION, 105, Hidamarinooka 5-chome Kuwana-shi, Mie 511-0867 / JP | Representative(s) | Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [2021/33] | Application number, filing date | 19870489.2 | 03.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019JP39069 | Priority number, date | JP20180190582 | 09.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018190582 | JP20180190583 | 09.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018190583 | JP20190072001 | 04.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019072001 | JP20190079604 | 18.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019079604 | [2021/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020075617 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3865706 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3865706 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F03D13/40, F03B11/00, F03D3/06, F03D13/20, F03B17/06 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
F03B17/061 (EP,KR);
F03D13/40 (EP,KR,US);
F03D13/10 (US);
B65D88/12 (KR);
B65D90/008 (KR);
F03B11/00 (KR);
F03B3/04 (KR);
F03D13/20 (EP,KR);
F03D3/005 (KR,US);
F03D3/06 (EP);
F03D3/064 (KR);
F03D9/008 (US);
H02S40/38 (KR);
F05B2240/142 (EP,KR);
F05B2240/211 (KR);
F05B2240/90 (US);
F05B2240/91521 (EP,KR);
F05B2260/02 (EP,KR);
Y02E10/20 (EP,KR);
Y02E10/50 (EP,KR);
Y02E10/728 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/33] | F03D13/40, F03B11/00, F03D3/06, F03D13/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IN EINEM CONTAINER UNTERGEBRACHTE WINDENERGIEERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT VERTIKALER WELLE UND WASSERKRAFTERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/33] | English: | VERTICAL SHAFT WIND POWER GENERATION DEVICE AND HYDROPOWER GENERATION DEVICE ACCOMMODATED IN CONTAINER | [2021/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE ÉOLIENNE À ARBRE VERTICAL ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE HYDRAULIQUE LOGÉ DANS UN CONTAINER | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2021 | Translation filed | 06.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 27.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.12.2023 | CZ | 13.12.2023 | EE | 13.12.2023 | ES | 13.12.2023 | HR | 13.12.2023 | IT | 13.12.2023 | LT | 13.12.2023 | LV | 13.12.2023 | NL | 13.12.2023 | PL | 13.12.2023 | RO | 13.12.2023 | RS | 13.12.2023 | SE | 13.12.2023 | SK | 13.12.2023 | SM | 13.12.2023 | BG | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.03.2024 | GR | 14.03.2024 | IS | 13.04.2024 | PT | 15.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 13.12.2023 | |
CZ | 13.12.2023 | ||
EE | 13.12.2023 | ||
ES | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RO | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 13.12.2023 | |
ES | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 13.12.2023 | |
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 14.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2008231057 (ZEUNER KENNETH W [US]); | [Y]US2010140949 (PITRE JOHN [US], et al); | [Y]US2011146751 (MCGUIRE DENNIS [US], et al); | [A]US2011176256 (VAN STRATEN GEORGE [US]); | [XYI]US2012007365 (HARRISON JANE [US], et al); | [A]US2016108893 (AGTUCA PETE [US]) | International search | [A]JP2007187043 (SHINKO ELECTRIC CO LTD)[A] 21; | [Y]US2010140949 (PITRE JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 6-7 * , 0064, 16 - 17 & WO 2010/021733 A2 *; | [Y]JP4791353B [Y] 8 * , 0011 - 0012, 1 - 2 & US 2006/0260672 A1, 0021 - 0022, 1 - 2 & WO 2004/090327 A2 & CH 695707 A5 & CA 2521893 A1 & CN 1802504 A *; | [XY]US2012007365 (HARRISON JANE [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 9-20 * , 0022-0037, 1 - 6 & WO 2012/006411 A1 & CN 103119778 A * [Y] 6-8; | [X]JP5599926B [X] 21 * , 0013 - 0 0 1 6, 1 - 3 *; | [X]US2015300321 (HAAR JONATHAN [US]) [X] 1-5 * , 0027 - 0042, 1 - 5 & WO 2015/160423 A1 * | by applicant | JP4563179B | JP4791353B | JP5557858B | JP2017218998 |