EP3864459 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING DEPTH-RESOLVED TISSUE BIREFRINGENCE USING SINGLE INPUT STATE POLARIZATION SENSITIVE OPTICAL COHERENCE TOMOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | For all designated states Nanyang Technological University 50 Nanyang Avenue Singapore 639798 / SG | [2023/37] |
Former [2021/33] | For all designated states THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | ||
For all designated states Nanyang Technical University 50 Nanyang Avenue Singapore 639798 / SG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUMA, Brett 12 Monmouth Street Quincy, MA 02171 / US | 02 /
VILLIGER, Martin 863 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 03 /
LIU, Linbo 27 William Street, Apt. 11 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 04 /
LIU, Xinyu 50 Nanyang Avenue Singapore 639798 / SG | 05 /
XIONG, Qiaozhou 50 Nanyang Avenue Singapore 639798 / SG | 06 /
WANG, Nanshuo 50 Nanyang Avenue Singapore 639798 / SG | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2024/39] |
Former [2021/33] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19870605.3 | 14.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019US56048 | Priority number, date | US201862744917P | 12.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862744917 P | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020077328 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3864459 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3864459 | Date: | 25.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/28 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
G02B27/283 (EP);
G01B9/02091 (EP,US);
G01N21/23 (EP,US);
G01N21/4795 (EP);
G01B2290/70 (EP,US);
G01N33/4833 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DER TIEFENAUFGELÖSTEN GEWEBEDOPPELBRECHUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER GEGENÜBER EINZELEINGABESTATUS-POLARISIERUNG EMPFINDLICHEN OPTISCHEN KOHÄRENZTOMOGRAFIE | [2021/33] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING DEPTH-RESOLVED TISSUE BIREFRINGENCE USING SINGLE INPUT STATE POLARIZATION SENSITIVE OPTICAL COHERENCE TOMOGRAPHY | [2021/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR MESURER LA BIRÉFRINGENCE DE TISSU À RÉSOLUTION DE PROFONDEUR À L'AIDE D'UNE TOMOGRAPHIE PAR COHÉRENCE OPTIQUE SENSIBLE À LA POLARISATION À L'ÉTAT D'ENTRÉE UNIQUE | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 17.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2017349103 (TONAR WILLIAM L [US], et al); | [A]US2018014730 (LEE JUN [KR], et al); | [XA]US2018156596 (WANG HUI [US], et al) |