EP3864363 - FIREARM MONITORING AND REMOTE SUPPORT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Armaments Research Company Inc. 6422 Broad Street Bethesda MD 20816 / US | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENG, William 6422 Broad Street Bethesda, Maryland 20816 / US | 02 /
CANTY, Michael 6422 Broad Street Bethesda, Maryland 20816 / US | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 2096 403 12 Göteborg / SE | [2021/33] | Application number, filing date | 19871033.7 | 11.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019US55925 | Priority number, date | US201862745028P | 12.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862745028 P | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020077254 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3864363 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3864363 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F41A17/06, H04W4/02, H04L67/52, F41G9/00, F41G3/04, G06V20/20, H04W4/38, F41G3/14, G08B25/10, F41A17/30, H04W24/08, H04W4/029, H04L67/12 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
F41G3/147 (US);
G06F1/163 (US);
G06F3/04817 (US);
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
G06T15/005 (US);
G06V20/20 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/026 (EP,US);
H04W4/027 (US);
H04W4/38 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | F41A17/06, H04W4/029, H04W24/08, F41A17/30, G08B25/10, F41G3/14, H04W4/38, G06V20/20, F41G3/04, F41G9/00, H04L67/52, H04W4/02 | ||
Former IPC [2021/33] | F41A17/06, H04L29/08, H04W4/029, H04W24/08, F41A17/30, G08B25/10, F41G3/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUSSWAFFENÜBERWACHUNGS- UND -FERNUNTERSTÜTZUNGSSYSTEM | [2021/33] | English: | FIREARM MONITORING AND REMOTE SUPPORT SYSTEM | [2021/33] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE ET DE SUPPORT À DISTANCE D'ARME À FEU | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 16.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24185399.3 / EP4415335 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011173869 (UHM HYUN DUK [KR]); | [XI]US2017146319 (LYREN PHILIP SCOTT [CN]); | [A]US9752840 (BETRO JONPAUL [US]); | [XI]WO2018140835 (ARMAMENTS RES COMPANY LLC [US]) | International search | [Y]US6882128 (RAHMEL RONALD S [US], et al); | [Y]US2005119801 (FLORENTIN ITZHAK [IL], et al); | [Y]US2013193645 (KAZAKOV DMITRI [AU], et al); | [Y]US2016173832 (STEWART ROBERT J [US], et al); | [DYDX]WO2018140835 (ARMAMENTS RES COMPANY LLC [US]) |