EP3866152 - PIXEL AND DISPLAY APPARATUS INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro, Giheung-Gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-Do 17113 / KR | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWAG, Jin Oh 1, Samsung-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | 02 /
OH, Won Sik 1, Samsung-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | 03 /
SONG, Keun Kyu 1, Samsung-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | 04 /
JO, Sung-Chan 1, Samsung-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | 05 /
CHO, Hyun Min 1, Samsung-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/33] | Shearman, James Ward Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 19871143.4 | 11.04.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019KR04387 | Priority number, date | KR20180122088 | 12.10.2018 Original published format: KR 20180122088 | [2021/33] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020075937 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3866152 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32, H01L27/15, H01L25/075, H01L33/62, G09G3/3233 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
H01L25/0753 (EP);
G09G3/32 (US);
G09G3/3233 (EP);
H01L33/62 (EP);
G09G2300/0426 (US);
G09G2300/0804 (EP);
G09G2300/0809 (US);
G09G2300/0819 (EP);
G09G2300/0842 (EP);
G09G2300/0861 (EP);
G09G2310/08 (US);
G09G2320/0271 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/33] | G09G3/32, H01L27/15 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Title | German: | PIXEL UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2021/33] | English: | PIXEL AND DISPLAY APPARATUS INCLUDING SAME | [2021/33] | French: | PIXEL ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE LE COMPRENANT | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2021 | Translation filed | 12.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 21.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]KR20160010537 (LUXVUE TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]KR20170001808 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3185326 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14* figures 1-3; claims 1-9 * | International search | [Y]KR20160010537 (LUXVUE TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [Y] 1-20; | [Y]KR20170001808 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-20; | [A]KR20170013469 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20; | [A]KR20170121676 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR])[A] 1-20; | [A]KR20180024618 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20 |