EP3865612 - NOVEL FABRIC HAVING NETWORK STRUCTURE FORMED BY COLLAGEN FIBER BUNDLES, AND NOVEL LEATHER PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guangdong Wuyuan New Material Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 22, Xianke Second Road Huadu District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510800 / CN | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Liwen Guangzhou Wuyuan New Material Co., Ltd. No. 21, Pingbu Avenue, Huadu District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510850 / CN | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/33] | Application number, filing date | 19872104.5 | 15.03.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019CN78252 | Priority number, date | CN201811175017 | 09.10.2018 Original published format: CN201811175017 | [2021/33] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020073602 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3865612 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3865612 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D04B1/14, D03D15/233, D01C3/00, D06N3/00 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
D04B1/14 (EP,CN,KR);
D06N3/0006 (CN,KR,US);
D01C3/00 (EP,KR);
D03D15/00 (CN);
D03D15/208 (KR,US);
D03D15/233 (EP,KR);
D06N3/0009 (CN,KR);
D06N3/0018 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D06N2209/103 (CN,KR,US);
D06N2211/28 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D10B2211/06 (EP,KR);
D10B2401/063 (CN,KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/33] | D04B1/14, D03D15/00, D06N3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUARTIGES GEWEBE MIT AUS KOLLAGENFASERBÜNDELN GEFORMTER NETZSTRUKTUR UND NEUARTIGES LEDERPRODUKT | [2021/33] | English: | NOVEL FABRIC HAVING NETWORK STRUCTURE FORMED BY COLLAGEN FIBER BUNDLES, AND NOVEL LEATHER PRODUCT | [2021/33] | French: | TISSU NOUVEAU PRÉSENTANT UNE STRUCTURE EN RÉSEAU FORMÉE PAR DES TOUFFES DE FIBRES DE COLLAGÈNE, ET PRODUIT EN CUIR NOUVEAU | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2021 | Translation filed | 02.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 16.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | DK | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | NL | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN201801713U (LIWEN ZHANG) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0007] - [0016] - [0034] - [0045]; figures 1-3 *; | [XAYI]CN102267253 (HAINAN XINLONG NONWOVENS CO LTD) [X] 1-5,11 * paragraphs [0031] , [0040]; figure 1 * [A] 7,9,10,12 [Y] 8 [I] 6; | [A]US2016376737 (MARGA FRANCOISE SUZANNE [US], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0056] , [0073] - [0079] *; | [XAYI]CN107780235 (HAN HONGYU) [X] 7,9,12 * paragraphs [0010] , [0012]; figure 1 * [A] 1-6,11 [Y] 8 [I] 10 | International search | [A]JPH04136241 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [A] 1-12* entire document *; | [A]DE10162463 (TECHTEX GMBH VLIESSTOFFE [DE]) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [Y]CN101235579 (LIWEN ZHANG [CN]) [Y] 1-12 * description, specific embodiments, and figures 1-2 *; | [A]CN206406534U (HANGZHOU HAIYUE TEXTILE TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [Y]CN107107585 (KYOWA LEATHER CLOTH) [Y] 1-12 * description, specific embodiment, and figure 1 *; | [PX]CN109082763 (GUANGZHOU WUYUAN NEW MAT CO LTD) [PX] 1-12 * claims 1-12 * |