EP3865274 - CUSHION MATERIAL FOR HOT PRESS, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING CUSHION MATERIAL FOR HOT PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamauchi Corporation 2-7 Shodai-tajika Hirakata, Osaka 573-1132 / JP | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Akira c/o YAMAUCHI CORP. 2-7, Shodai-tajika Hirakata-shi Osaka 573-1132 / JP | 02 /
KOUNO, Shuhei c/o YAMAUCHI CORP. 2-7, Shodai-tajika Hirakata-shi Osaka 573-1132 / JP | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [2024/25] |
Former [2021/33] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19872130.0 | 30.09.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019JP38541 | Priority number, date | JP20180190649 | 09.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018190649 | [2021/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020075556 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3865274 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3865274 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29C43/32, B29C70/30, B29C70/68, B30B15/02, B32B27/12 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
B29C70/504 (EP,US);
B29C43/32 (EP,KR);
B29C43/18 (KR);
B29C43/206 (KR);
B29C43/3642 (US);
B29C63/02 (KR);
B29C65/48 (KR);
B29C70/30 (EP,KR,US);
B29C70/68 (KR);
B30B15/02 (KR);
B30B15/061 (EP,US);
B32B25/042 (EP);
B32B25/06 (EP);
B32B25/08 (EP,US);
B32B25/10 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/10 (EP);
B32B27/12 (EP,KR);
B32B29/02 (EP);
B32B3/26 (EP);
B32B5/022 (EP);
B32B5/024 (EP);
B32B5/26 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
B29C2043/185 (KR);
B29C2043/189 (KR);
B29C2043/3205 (KR);
B29C2043/3655 (US);
B29C2043/366 (KR);
B29K2021/00 (EP);
B29K2027/18 (EP);
B29K2071/00 (EP);
B29K2077/00 (EP);
B29K2105/06 (EP);
B29K2995/0016 (US);
B32B2250/03 (EP);
B32B2255/02 (EP);
B32B2255/26 (EP);
B32B2260/021 (EP);
B32B2260/048 (EP);
B32B2262/0223 (EP);
B32B2262/0253 (EP);
B32B2262/0261 (EP);
B32B2262/0269 (EP);
B32B2262/0276 (EP);
B32B2262/101 (EP);
B32B2307/306 (EP,US);
B32B2307/558 (EP);
B32B2307/718 (EP);
B32B2307/72 (EP);
B32B2307/724 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLSTERMATERIAL FÜR HEISSPRESSE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLSTERMATERIAL FÜR EINE HEISSPRESSE | [2021/33] | English: | CUSHION MATERIAL FOR HOT PRESS, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING CUSHION MATERIAL FOR HOT PRESS | [2021/33] | French: | MATÉRIAU D'AMORTISSEMENT POUR PRESSE À CHAUD ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2021 | Translation filed | 26.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 07.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1462233 (YAMAUCHI CORP [JP]); | [XYI]EP1839833 (YAMAUCHI CORP [JP]); | [X]EP3162527 (YAMAUCHI CORP [JP]); | [Y]EP2719513 (YAMAUCHI CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]JPH0890577 (YAMAUCHI CORP); | [YA]JP2003211472 (SHOWA ELECTRIC WIRE & CABLE CO); | [A]JP2013132889 (OKUDA CORP); | [YA]JP2016010945 (YAMAUCHI CORP); | [A]JP2016168845 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD); | [YA]JP2017185706 (KINYOSHA KK) | by applicant | JP2004344962 | JP2011116034 | JP2014087999 |