EP3868247 - ORNAMENT CAPABLE OF ADJUSTING AMOUNT OF EMITTED FRAGRANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ceraart Co., Ltd. 6F, 27, Dunchon-daero 457beon-gil Jungwon-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13219 / KR | [2023/39] |
Former [2021/34] | For all designated states Ceraart Co., Ltd. 6F, 27, Dunchon-daero 457beon-gil Jungwon-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13219 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EUN, Kyoung A 103-303, 14-24, Dokgogae-gil, Chowol-eup Gwangju-si Gyeonggi-do 12807 / KR | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/39] | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Postfach 18 04 09 40571 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2021/34] | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19872543.4 | 17.07.2019 | [2021/34] | WO2019KR08854 | Priority number, date | KR20180123134 | 16.10.2018 Original published format: KR 20180123134 | KR20190026001 | 06.03.2019 Original published format: KR 20190026001 | KR20190000932U | 06.03.2019 Original published format: KR 20190000932 U | [2021/34] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020080649 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3868247 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3868247 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A44C15/00 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
A44C15/002 (EP,KR,US);
A44C17/006 (KR);
A61L9/03 (US);
A61L2209/133 (US);
A61L2209/134 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/34] | A44C15/00, A44C17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORNAMENT ZUR EINSTELLUNG DER MENGE AN EMITTIERTEM DUFTSTOFF | [2021/34] | English: | ORNAMENT CAPABLE OF ADJUSTING AMOUNT OF EMITTED FRAGRANCE | [2021/34] | French: | BIJOU PERMETTANT DE RÉGLER LA QUANTITÉ DE PARFUM ÉMISE | [2021/34] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2021 | Translation filed | 22.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 15.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2023 | CZ | 27.09.2023 | DK | 27.09.2023 | EE | 27.09.2023 | ES | 27.09.2023 | FI | 27.09.2023 | HR | 27.09.2023 | LT | 27.09.2023 | LV | 27.09.2023 | NL | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SE | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | PT | 29.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 27.09.2023 | |
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US6367706 (PUTZ LARRY J [US]) [I] 1-17 * column 2, line 53 - line 54; figures 1-8 *[A] 18-21; | [IA]WO2018011780 (AAB CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1-17 * page 4, line 6 - line 8; figure 1 * * page 8, line 1 - line 3 * [A] 18-21 | International search | [YA]JP3188540U (SAKATA CORP.) [Y] 1-6, 18-21 * See paragraphs [0034]-[0038] and figures 1-5. * [A] 7-17; | [A]KR200323056Y (KO, Young Hee) [A] 1-21* See claim 3 and figures 2-3. *; | [A]KR200359069Y (LEE, Jae Hyung) [A] 1-21 * See pages 2-3 and figures 1-2. *; | [A]KR200470374Y (AMOREPACIFIC CORPORATION) [A] 1-21 * See paragraphs [0024]-[0026] and figures 3-6. *; | [Y]KR20140086891 (HALLA VISTEON CLIMATE CONTROL [KR], et al) [Y] 1-6, 18-21 * See paragraphs [0031]-[0035] and figures 3-6. * |